DIGENOVA v. UNITE HERE LOCAL 274 et al
Plaintiff: JOSEPH DIGENOVA
Defendant: UNITE HERE LOCAL 274 and SONESTA HOTEL
Case Number: 2:2019cv02122
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL M BAYLSON
Referring Judge: WENDY BEETLESTONE
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY TO UNITE HERE'S DEFINITIVE MOTION REQUEST, filed by JOSEPH DIGENOVA. (va, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM re "Amended Complaint" filed by SONESTA HOTEL.Memorandum; Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(KINDIG, KELLY)
June 13, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for More Definite Statement in Response to Plaintiff's "Statement of Facts, Corrections, and Evidence" filed by UNITE HERE LOCAL 274.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Memorandum, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(HOYE, LAUREN) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/13/2019) (md, ).
May 30, 2019 Filing 10 STATEMENT OF FACTS, CORRECTIONS, & EVIDENCE. NO ENVLOPE.(sg, )
May 29, 2019 Notice of Pro Se Guidelines sent to the proper address. (nd, )
May 29, 2019 Filing 9 Copy of Order/Notice dated Notice of Pro Se Guidelines (Document # 2) and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to Joseph DiGenova for the following reason: No Such Number./Unable to Forward. (nd, )
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL V. JOHNS on behalf of SONESTA HOTEL with Certificate of Service(JOHNS, DANIEL)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE TO HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON AS RELATED TO JOSEPH DIGENOVA V UNITE HERE LOCAL 274, ET AL, CIVIL ACTION 15-CV-4143, 16-CV-1222 AND 18-0883. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 5/21/19. 5/23/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF AND E-MAILED.(rf, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by UNITE HERE LOCAL 274.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(HOYE, LAUREN)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by SONESTA HOTEL.Memorandum; Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to D, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(KINDIG, KELLY)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by UNITE HERE LOCAL 274 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO REMOVAL (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(HOYE, LAUREN)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by LAUREN M. HOYE on behalf of UNITE HERE LOCAL 274 with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(HOYE, LAUREN)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (ahf)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SONESTA HOTEL from Philadelphia Court of Common Pleas, case number 190202580. Certificate of Service. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 197441) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Part 1, #2 Exhibit Part 2)(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DIGENOVA v. UNITE HERE LOCAL 274 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH DIGENOVA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITE HERE LOCAL 274
Represented By: LAUREN M. HOYE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SONESTA HOTEL
Represented By: KELLY KINDIG
Represented By: DANIEL V. JOHNS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?