WILSON v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON et al
Plaintiff: TANYEONH WILSON
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES, INC., RITE AID CORPORATION, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, RITE AID OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC. and JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER PRODUCTS COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv02138
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GERALD A MCHUGH
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND (DOC. NO. #6 ) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD A. MCHUGH ON 7/10/2019.7/11/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by TANYEONH WILSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(WINKLER, NANCY)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER PRODUCTS COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Certificate of Service G)(MILLER, CHANDA)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by TANYEONH WILSON.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(WINKLER, NANCY)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint together with AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER PRODUCTS COMPANY.(MILLER, CHANDA)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by TANYEONH WILSON re #1 Notice of Removal,, (WINKLER, NANCY)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by TODD A. SCHOENHAUS on behalf of TANYEONH WILSON (SCHOENHAUS, TODD)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent JOHNSON & JOHNSON for JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES, INC.. with Certificate of Service by JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER PRODUCTS COMPANY.(ahf)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER PRODUCTS COMPANY from Philadelphia Court of Common Pleas, case number 190404489. Certificate of Service.(Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 197478) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B-1, #3 Exhibit B-2, #4 Exhibit B-3, #5 Exhibit B-4, #6 Exhibit B-5, #7 Exhibit B-6, #8 Exhibit B-7, #9 Exhibit B-8, #10 Exhibit B-9, #11 Exhibit B-10, #12 Exhibit B-11)(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILSON v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES, INC.
Represented By: CHANDA A MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RITE AID CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Represented By: CHANDA A MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RITE AID OF PENNSYLVANIA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER PRODUCTS COMPANY
Represented By: CHANDA A MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TANYEONH WILSON
Represented By: TODD A. SCHOENHAUS
Represented By: NANCY J. WINKLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?