PHILIPS HEALTHCARE v. GATEWAY RADIOLOGY CONSULTANTS, P.A. et al
Plaintiff: PHILIPS HEALTHCARE
Defendant: GATEWAY RADIOLOGY CONSULTANTS, P.A., MD VIMAL H. PATEL, PM RADIOLOGY, LLC and MD GAGANDEEP S. MANGAT
Case Number: 2:2019cv02143
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: R BARCLAY SURRICK
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY by PHILIPS HEALTHCARE under Chapter Number 11 of the Bankruptcy Code in the Bankruptcy Court for the District of Florida filed under case number 8:19-bk-05794-MGW . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(WOLIN, MARC)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY by PHILIPS HEALTHCARE under Chapter Number 11 of the Bankruptcy Code in the Bankruptcy Court for the District of Middle District Florida filed under case number 8:19-bk-04971 only as to defendant Gateway Radiology Consultants, P.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(WOLIN, MARC)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V., Corporate Parent PHILIPS HOLDING USA INC. for PHILIPS HEALTHCARE. by PHILIPS HEALTHCARE.(jaa, )
May 15, 2019 4 Summons Issued as to GATEWAY RADIOLOGY CONSULTANTS, P.A., GAGANDEEP S. MANGAT, VIMAL H. PATEL, PM RADIOLOGY, LLC. Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 5/17/19 (jaa, ) Modified on 5/21/2019 (jaa, ). *SUMMONSES ISSUED IN ERROR.
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT IN CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT against GATEWAY RADIOLOGY CONSULTANTS, P.A., GAGANDEEP S. MANGAT, VIMAL H. PATEL, PM RADIOLOGY, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 197483.) filed by PHILIPS HEALTHCARE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jaa, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/17/2019: #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit) (jaa, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PHILIPS HEALTHCARE v. GATEWAY RADIOLOGY CONSULTANTS, P.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHILIPS HEALTHCARE
Represented By: MARC E. WOLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GATEWAY RADIOLOGY CONSULTANTS, P.A.
Represented By: MARC E. WOLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD VIMAL H. PATEL
Represented By: MARC E. WOLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PM RADIOLOGY, LLC
Represented By: MARC E. WOLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD GAGANDEEP S. MANGAT
Represented By: MARC E. WOLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?