MORAN v. WESTFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: MICHAEL MORAN
Defendant: WESTFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv02174
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GERALD J PAPPERT
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 6/24/19. 6/24/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kf, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 Letter by WESTFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY re Parties have settled this matter (TARANTO, DAMIAN) Modified on 6/25/2019 (lisad, ).
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss Partial Motion to Dismiss filed by WESTFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY.Memorandum of Law In Support of Motion to Dismiss and Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief Westfield's Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(HAGGERTY, JOHN)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of DELAWARE County. (fdc)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WESTFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY from COURT OF COMMON PLEAS DELAWARE COUNTY, case number CV-2019-003436. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE197595), EXHIBITS, CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit, #3 Errata, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Designation Form, #8 Case Management Track Form, #9 Certificate of Service)(rf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MORAN v. WESTFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL MORAN
Represented By: AUGUST J. OBER, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: JOHN J. HAGGERTY
Represented By: DAMIAN M. TARANTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?