DIGIORGIO v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Plaintiff: RICHARD DIGIORGIO
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Case Number: 2:2019cv02181
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JUAN R SANCHEZ
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45:51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER THAT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/22/2019 10:30 AM. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE LINDA K. CARACAPPA ON 7/17/19. 7/17/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ Pretrial Conference held on 7/9/19. (rf, ) Modified on 7/12/2019 (md).
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT DISCOVERY DUE BY 10/10/2019., DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS DUE BY 11/15/2019., MOTION IN LIMINE DUE BY 12/20/2019., FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/8/2020 11:00 AM; SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 12/12/2019 11:00 AM; PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 1/6/2020., DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 1/6/2020., TRIAL POOL SET FOR 1/13/2020. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 7/9/19. 7/10/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE LINDA K. CARACAPPA FOR A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 7/9/19. 7/10/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 Report Of Rule 26(f) Meeting by RICHARD DIGIORGIO. (OLLEY, MICHAEL)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT RULE 16 PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 7/9/2019 11:30 AM. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 6/25/19. 6/26/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint together with with Affirmative Defenses by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK).(HOHN, RICHARD)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN DOUGHERTY on behalf of NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK), Jury Demand. (DOUGHERTY, STEPHEN) Modified on 6/13/2019 (md).
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD K. HOHN on behalf of NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK), Jury Demand. (HOHN, RICHARD) Modified on 6/13/2019 (md).
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service by United States Post Office re: served Complaint upon Eleanor D. Acheson by Certified Mail on 06/03/2019 (OLLEY, MICHAEL)
May 20, 2019 Summons Issued as to NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK). Forwarded To: Michael J. Olley on 5/20/19 (fdc, )
May 20, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by RICHARD DIGIORGIO. (fdc)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 197600.), filed by RICHARD DIGIORGIO.(fdc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DIGIORGIO v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
Represented By: STEPHEN DOUGHERTY
Represented By: RICHARD K. HOHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD DIGIORGIO
Represented By: MICHAEL J. OLLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?