REYNOLDS v. CHESAPEAKE & DELAWARE BREWING HOLDINGS, LLC et al
Plaintiff: CHRISTINA MARY REYNOLDS
Defendant: MARK EDELSON, DOE DEFENDANTS 1-10, KEVIN DAVIES, IRON HILL BREWERY, LLC, CHESAPEAKE & DELAWARE BREWING HOLDINGS, LLC, CHESAPEAKE & DELAWARE BREWING PENNSYLVANIA HOLDINGS, LLC and KEVIN FINN
Case Number: 2:2019cv02184
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JUAN R SANCHEZ
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CHESAPEAKE & DELAWARE BREWING HOLDINGS, LLC, CHESAPEAKE & DELAWARE BREWING PENNSYLVANIA HOLDINGS, LLC, IRON HILL BREWERY, LLC.(CROWTHER, CURTIS)
July 16, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Certificate of Service by CHESAPEAKE & DELAWARE BREWING HOLDINGS, LLC, CHESAPEAKE & DELAWARE BREWING PENNSYLVANIA HOLDINGS, LLC, KEVIN DAVIES, MARK EDELSON, KEVIN FINN, IRON HILL BREWERY, LLC.(CROWTHER, CURTIS)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF SCOTT A. HOLT (ECF NO. #8 ) FOR ADMISSION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 07/12/2019.07/12/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO ATTORNEY WITH ECF APPLICATION AND E-MAILED.(nd, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Scott A. Holt, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13664737.) filed by CHESAPEAKE & DELAWARE BREWING HOLDINGS, LLC, CHESAPEAKE & DELAWARE BREWING PENNSYLVANIA HOLDINGS, LLC, KEVIN DAVIES, MARK EDELSON, KEVIN FINN, IRON HILL BREWERY, LLC.Certificate of Service.(CROWTHER, CURTIS)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE TIME FOR ALL DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER, PLEAD OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IN THIS ACTION IS EXTENDED TO 7/16/2019. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 7/8/2019. 7/8/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by CURTIS J. CROWTHER on behalf of CHESAPEAKE & DELAWARE BREWING HOLDINGS, LLC, CHESAPEAKE & DELAWARE BREWING PENNSYLVANIA HOLDINGS, LLC, KEVIN DAVIES, MARK EDELSON, KEVIN FINN, IRON HILL BREWERY, LLC with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CROWTHER, CURTIS)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT APPLICATION OF MATTHEW D. BRADY, ESQ., TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO L.R.C.P. 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 6/25/19.6/25/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED TO UNREPRESENTED PARTY.(kw, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Matthew D. Brady ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13627302.) filed by CHRISTINA MARY REYNOLDS.Certificate of Service.(LYNCH, GARY)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by GARY F. LYNCH on behalf of CHRISTINA MARY REYNOLDS (LYNCH, GARY)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Talone & Associates re: served Summons and Complaint upon CHESAPEAKE & DELAWARE BREWING HOLDINGS, LLC; CHESAPEAKE & DELAWARE BREWING PENNSYLVANIA HOLDINGS, LLC; IRON HILL BREWERY, LLC; KEVIN FINN, MARK EDELSON, KEVIN DAVIES by Personal Service on 06/11/2019 (GRAY, ROBERT)
May 20, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by CHRISTINA MARY REYNOLDS. (jl, )
May 20, 2019 6 Summons Issued as to CHESAPEAKE & DELAWARE BREWING HOLDINGS, LLC, CHESAPEAKE & DELAWARE BREWING PENNSYLVANIA HOLDINGS, LLC, KEVIN DAVIES, MARK EDELSON, KEVIN FINN, IRON HILL BREWERY, LLC. Forwarded To: ROBERT GRAY on 5/21/19 (jl, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CHESAPEAKE & DELAWARE BREWING HOLDINGS, LLC, CHESAPEAKE & DELAWARE BREWING PENNSYLVANIA HOLDINGS, LLC, KEVIN DAVIES, DOE DEFENDANTS 1-10, MARK EDELSON, KEVIN FINN, IRON HILL BREWERY, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE197598.), filed by CHRISTINA MARY REYNOLDS, JURY DEMAND. (Attachments: #1 CASE FORMS)(jl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: REYNOLDS v. CHESAPEAKE & DELAWARE BREWING HOLDINGS, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK EDELSON
Represented By: CURTIS J. CROWTHER
Represented By: SCOTT A. HOLT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE DEFENDANTS 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN DAVIES
Represented By: CURTIS J. CROWTHER
Represented By: SCOTT A. HOLT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IRON HILL BREWERY, LLC
Represented By: CURTIS J. CROWTHER
Represented By: SCOTT A. HOLT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHESAPEAKE & DELAWARE BREWING HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: CURTIS J. CROWTHER
Represented By: SCOTT A. HOLT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHESAPEAKE & DELAWARE BREWING PENNSYLVANIA HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: CURTIS J. CROWTHER
Represented By: SCOTT A. HOLT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN FINN
Represented By: CURTIS J. CROWTHER
Represented By: SCOTT A. HOLT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTINA MARY REYNOLDS
Represented By: ROBERT J. GRAY
Represented By: MATTHEW D. BRADY
Represented By: GERALD D. WELLS, III
Represented By: GARY F. LYNCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?