SIMON v. FORT DEARBORN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

Plaintiff: REBECCA SIMON
Defendant: FORT DEARBORN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv02186
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL M BAYLSON
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Nancy L. Cavey, Esquire filed by REBECCA SIMON.Certifications of Uncontested Motion and Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CASPER, ALAN)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF THOMAS B. ORLANDO, ESQUIRE TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(b) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 7/15/19. 7/15/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED (W/ECF APP) AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) .
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13667132.) filed by FORT DEARBORN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(EVERLY, KYLE)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Thomas B. Orlando filed by FORT DEARBORN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY.Application for Admission PHV. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order). (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; SEE PAPER #7 FOR CORRECT FILING). (EVERLY, KYLE) Modified on 7/15/2019 (fb).
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT, FORT DEARBORN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY MAY HAVE ADDITIONAL TIME, UNTIL 7/23/19, TO ANSWER PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MICHAEL M. BAYLSON ON 7/8/19. 7/8/19 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by FORT DEARBORN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, Certificate of Service.(FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL). (EVERLY, KYLE) Modified on 7/8/2019 (fb).
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by KYLE GARRETT EVERLY on behalf of FORT DEARBORN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(EVERLY, KYLE)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by REBECCA SIMON re #1 Complaint by Certification of Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(CASPER, ALAN)
May 20, 2019 Summons Issued as to FORT DEARBORN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. 1 Forwarded To: Counsel on 5/21/2019 (ahf)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FORT DEARBORN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 197603.), filed by REBECCA SIMON.(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SIMON v. FORT DEARBORN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FORT DEARBORN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: THOMAS B. ORLANDO
Represented By: KYLE GARRETT EVERLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REBECCA SIMON
Represented By: ALAN H. CASPER
Represented By: NANCY L. CAVEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?