BENCO DENTAL SUPPLY COMPANY v. COLUR WORLD, LLC
Plaintiff: BENCO DENTAL SUPPLY COMPANY
Defendant: COLUR WORLD, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv02188
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JUAN R SANCHEZ
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION (DOC. NO. #8 ) IS GRANTED AND BENCO DENTAL SUPPLY COMPANY SHALL ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO DEFENDANT COLUR WORLD, LLC'S COUNTERCLAIMS ON OR BEFORE 9/3/2019. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 7/1/2019.7/1/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(amas)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer [UNOPPOSED] filed by BENCO DENTAL SUPPLY COMPANY.Certificate of Service.(BREWER, DANIEL)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY D. PECSENYE on behalf of COLUR WORLD, LLC with Certificate of Service(PECSENYE, TIMOTHY)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by COLUR WORLD, LLC.(ARYANI-SABET, SAMAR)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 Colur World, LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and, COUNTERCLAIM against BENCO DENTAL SUPPLY COMPANY by COLUR WORLD, LLC.(ARYANI-SABET, SAMAR)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BENCO DENTAL SUPPLY COMPANY. COLUR WORLD, LLC waiver sent on 5/20/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. (BREWER, DANIEL)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY L. EICHEN on behalf of BENCO DENTAL SUPPLY COMPANY with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(EICHEN, JEFFREY)
May 20, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by BENCO DENTAL SUPPLY COMPANY. (ahf)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by BENCO DENTAL SUPPLY COMPANY.(ahf,)
May 20, 2019 Summons Issued as to COLUR WORLD, LLC. 1 Given To: Counsel on 5/21/2019 (ahf)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COLUR WORLD, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 197607.), filed by BENCO DENTAL SUPPLY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Designation Form, #8 Case Management Track Form)(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BENCO DENTAL SUPPLY COMPANY v. COLUR WORLD, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BENCO DENTAL SUPPLY COMPANY
Represented By: DANIEL E. BREWER
Represented By: JEFFREY L. EICHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLUR WORLD, LLC
Represented By: SAMAR ARYANI-SABET
Represented By: TIMOTHY D. PECSENYE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?