GREEN v. CITY OF PHILADELPHIA et al
Plaintiff: SHAMAR GREEN and WILLIAM GREEN
Defendant: CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, LT. HORSEY and PHILADELPHIA DEPARTMENT OF PRISONS
Case Number: 2:2019cv02190
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: WENDY BEETLESTONE
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 1 Summons and copy of Amended Complaint Issued as to HORSEY. 1 Forwarded To: US MARSHAL on 7/5/19. (va, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 Letter received 6/28/19 from SHAMAR GREEN, re: Violation of Rights. (va, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/2/2019: #1 IFP Application) (va, ).
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER THAT THE COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AS TO (A) ALL CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANTS CITY OF PHILADELPHIA AND PHILADELPHIA DEPARTMENT OF PRISONS, AND (B) THE OFFICIAL CAPACITY CLAIM AGAINST DEFENDANT LT HORSEY, PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1915 (E)(2)(B)(II). THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL ISSUE A SUMMONS TO DEFENDANT LT HORSEY. SERVICE OF THE SUMMONS, THE AMENDED COMPLAINT, AND A COPY OF THIS ORDER AND ACCOMPANYING MEMORANDUM IS TO BE MADE UPON THE DEFENDANT BY THE U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE. GREEN WILL BE REQUIRED TO COMPLETE A USM-285 FORM SO THAT THE MARSHALS CAN SERVE THE DEFENDANT. FAILURE TO COMPLETE THE FORM MAY RESULT IN DISMISSAL OF THIS CASE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 6/27/19. 6/28/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE. (va, ) Modified on 7/1/2019 (va, ).
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 6/27/19. 6/28/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE. (va, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, HORSEY, PHILADELPHIA DEPARTMENT OF PRISONS, filed by SHAMAR GREEN.(jpd, )
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. PLAINTIFF SHALL PAY THE FULL FILING FEE OF $350.00 IN INSTALLMENTS. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDER TO THE WARDEN P.I.C.C. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED AND DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ALL CLAIMS AND ALL DEFENDANTS. PLAINTFF IS GIVEN THIRTY (30) DAYS TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL PROVIDE THE PLAINTIFF WITH A BLANK COPY OF THIS COURT'S CURRENT STANDARD FORM FOR FILING A PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT BEARING THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CIVIL ACTION NUMBER. UPON THE FILING OF AN AMENDED COMPLAINT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL NOT MAKE SERVICE UNTIL SO ORDERED BY THE COURT. FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER HIS CASE MAY BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 6/6/19. 6/7/19 ENTERED AND COPY OF ORDER AND FORMS MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF (jpd).
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 6/6/19. 6/7/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(jpd, )
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL RETURN GREEN'S UNSIGNED COMPLAINT TO HIM AND SHALL RETAIN A COPY IN THE CIVIL ACTION FILE. IF GREEN SEEKS TO PROCEED WITH THIS CASE, HE SHALL SIGN THE COMPLAINT AND RETURN IT TO THE COURT WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 5/23/19. 5/24/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE WITH UNSIGNED COMPLAINT.(jl, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (ahf)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by SHAMAR GREEN. (ahf)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against CITY OF PHILADELPHIA, HORSEY, PHILADELPHIA DEPARTMENT OF PRISONS, filed by SHAMAR GREEN. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ahf) (Main Document 2 replaced on 5/31/2019) (jpd, ).
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS FILED BY SHAMAR GREEN.(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GREEN v. CITY OF PHILADELPHIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHAMAR GREEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM GREEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LT. HORSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILADELPHIA DEPARTMENT OF PRISONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?