SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION v. RAMSEY

Plaintiff: SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Defendant: MARK WAYNE RAMSEY and CHRISTIAN RAMSEY
Petitioner: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 2:2019cv02197
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GENE EK PRATTER
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION re: Jonathon Nave, Cavalier Courier & Process Service served Summons and Complaint upon MARK WAYNE RAMSEY by Personally by Hand. MARK WAYNE RAMSEY served on 7/2/2019, answer due 7/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KELLY, CHRISTOPHER)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 Application to Intervene and Stay Proceedings (with Proposed Order) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (IGNALL, DAVID) Modified on 7/18/2019 (fb).
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF HEARING: AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 10/2/2019 AT 2:30 PM IN CHAMBERS ROOM 10613 BEFORE THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Memorandum, #3 Memorandum)(sfl, )
May 21, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (jwl, )
May 21, 2019 Summons Issued as to MARK WAYNE RAMSEY. One Forwarded To: Counsel on 5/21/19 (jwl, )
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MARK WAYNE RAMSEY, filed by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Track Form, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form)(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION v. RAMSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK WAYNE RAMSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTIAN RAMSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER REYNOLDS KELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: DAVID J. IGNALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?