SUTTER et al v. CASCADES TISSUE GROUP - PENNSYLVANIA, INC. et al
Plaintiff: GLEN SUTTER and SHIRLEY SUTTER
Defendant: CASCADES HOLDING US, INC., POPE & TALBOT, WIS., INC., PLAINWELL, INC., CASCADES TISSUE GROUP - PENNSYLVANIA, INC., CASCADES TISSUE, LLC, METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO. and POPE & TALBOT, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02201
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File A Surreply to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand filed by CASCADES TISSUE GROUP - PENNSYLVANIA, INC..Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(CAGNOLI, JOSEPH)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by GLEN SUTTER, SHIRLEY SUTTER. (SHEIN, BENJAMIN)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by CASCADES TISSUE GROUP - PENNSYLVANIA, INC.. (MCNAMEE, GREGORY)
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by SHIRLEY SUTTER, GLEN SUTTER, Brief.(SHEIN, BENJAMIN) Modified on 6/11/2019 (md).
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance of John P. Kopesky by BENJAMIN P. SHEIN on behalf of SHIRLEY SUTTER, GLEN SUTTER. (SHEIN, BENJAMIN) Modified on 6/11/2019 (md).
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by BENJAMIN P. SHEIN on behalf of SHIRLEY SUTTER, GLEN SUTTER. (SHEIN, BENJAMIN) Modified on 6/11/2019 (md).
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent CASCADES USA INC., Corporate Parent LONGHORN PAPER PACKAGING LLC, Corporate Parent BEST DIAMOND PACKAGING LLC for CASCADES TISSUE GROUP - PENNSYLVANIA, INC.. with Certificate of Service by CASCADES TISSUE GROUP - PENNSYLVANIA, INC..(mbh, )
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal filed by CASCADES TISSUE GROUP - PENNSYLVANIA, INC. from Philadelphia Court of Common Pleas, case number 170901560. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE197679)(mbh, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/24/2019: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit) (md, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SUTTER et al v. CASCADES TISSUE GROUP - PENNSYLVANIA, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CASCADES HOLDING US, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POPE & TALBOT, WIS., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLAINWELL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CASCADES TISSUE GROUP - PENNSYLVANIA, INC.
Represented By: JOSEPH CAGNOLI, JR.
Represented By: GREGORY M. MCNAMEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CASCADES TISSUE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POPE & TALBOT, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLEN SUTTER
Represented By: BENJAMIN P. SHEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHIRLEY SUTTER
Represented By: BENJAMIN P. SHEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?