PURVIS v. PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE LIMITED
Plaintiff: STEFFANY PURVIS
Defendant: PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE LIMITED
Case Number: 2:2019cv02221
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CHAD F KENNEY
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Irving L Samuel re: served Complaint upon Zakita Pettus by hand deliv to business on June 6 2019 (MILLER, SOMMER)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: THAT AN ON THE RECORD INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (RULE 16) IS SCHEDULED FOR WEDNESDAY, AUGUST 21, 2019 AT 9:30 A.M. BEFORE THE HON. CHAD F. KENNEY, IN COURTROOM 6A. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 7/15/2019. 7/16/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (sme, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint together with Defenses by PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE LIMITED.(INGRAM, MALCOLM)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Drive Insurance Holdings, Inc., The Progressive Corporation with Certificate of Service by PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE LIMITED.(INGRAM, MALCOLM)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: THAT THE TIME WITHIN WHICH PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE LIMITED MAY RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT IS HEREBY EXTENDED THROUGH AND INCLUDING JULY 15, 2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 6/26/2019. 6/26/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (sme, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by MALCOLM JAMES INGRAM on behalf of PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE LIMITED with Certificate of Service(INGRAM, MALCOLM)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint filed by PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE LIMITED, Certificate of Service.(KAYE, MARJORIE) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL) Modified on 6/25/2019 (md).
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by MARJORIE KAYE, JR on behalf of PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE LIMITED with Certificate of Service(KAYE, MARJORIE)
May 22, 2019 1 Summons Issued as to PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE LIMITED. 1 Handed To: SOMMER MILLER on 5/22/19 (va, )
May 22, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by STEFFANY PURVIS. (va, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE LIMITED ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE197736.), filed by STEFFANY PURVIS. JURY DEMAND. (va, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PURVIS v. PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE LIMITED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE LIMITED
Represented By: MALCOLM JAMES INGRAM
Represented By: MARJORIE KAYE, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEFFANY PURVIS
Represented By: SOMMER MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?