HEATH v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Plaintiff: MONIQUE S. HEATH
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 2:2019cv02228
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: RICHARD A LLORET
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 US Marshal Return Re: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT SERVED UPON THE ATTY. GENERAL AND COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY BY CERTIFIED MAIL ON 6/7/2019. (amas)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney, Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (kw, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 Procedural Order 5/28/19 Entered and copy mailed to Heath. (fdc)
May 28, 2019 Summons Issued as to COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Forwarded To: U.S. Marshal Service, U.S. Attorney's Office on 5/28/19. (fdc)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S #1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL ISSUE SUMMONS. THE U.S. MARSHAL FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA SHALL SERVE THE SUMMONSES AND COMPLAINT IN ACCORDANCE WITH FRCP 4(I). SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD A. LLORET ON 5/23/19.5/28/19 ENTERED AND COPY MAILED TO HEATH. COPIES FORWARDED TO U.S. MARSHAL SERVICE & U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE. (fdc)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (ahf)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 Social Security Magistrate Consent by MONIQUE S. HEATH. (ahf)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL FILED BY MONIQUE S. HEATH.(ahf)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY, filed by MONIQUE S. HEATH. (ENVELOPE NOT INCLUDED)(ahf) (IFP GRANTED) Modified 5/28/19 (fdc).
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS FILED BY MONIQUE S. HEATH.(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HEATH v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONIQUE S. HEATH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?