CLARK et al v. DOE-WALKER et al

Plaintiff: MARK ANTHONY CLARK
Defendant: MARSHA DOE, JOHN DOE-WALKER, JOHN DOE-HAWKINS, PRIME CARE-HEALTH CARE DEPARTMENT, JOHN DOE-WHITESIDE, JOHN DOE-SERGEI, DIRECTOR GEORGE ROBERTS and WARDEN EDWARD MCFADDEN
Case Number: 2:2019cv02235
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JEFFREY L SCHMEHL
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1915, ETC. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDER TO THE SUPERINTENDENT OF SCI FRACKVILLE, ETC. FOR THE REASONS STATED IN THE COURT'S MEMORANDUM, CLARK'S CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANTS DIRECTOR GEORGE ROBERTS, "JOHN DOE-SERGEI," AND WARDEN EDWARD MCFADDEN ARE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, AND HIS CLAIMS AGAINST "MARSHA DOE NURSE" AND "PRIME CARE-HEALTH CARE DEPARTMENT" ARE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1915(E)(2)(B)(II), ETC. IF CLARK DOES NOT FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT THE COURT WILL DIRECT SERVICE OF HIS INITIAL COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANTS WALKER, WHITESIDE AND HAWKINS ONLY. CLARK MAY ALSO NOTIFY THE COURT THAT HE SEEKS TO PROCEED ON THESE CLAIMS RATHER THAN FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT. IF HE FILES SUCH A NOTICE, CLARK IS REMINDED TO INCLUDE THE CASE NUMBER FOR THIS CASE, 19-2235. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 6/14/19. 6/14/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED PRO SE PLAINTIFF, SUPERINTENDENT OF SCI FRACKVILLE.(er, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 6/14/19. 6/14/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TOP PRO SE PLAINTIFF.(er, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by MARK ANTHONY CLARK. (jwl, )
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT CLARK'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IF CLARK SEEKS TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, HE SHALL, WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, FILE A CERTIFIED COPY OF HIS PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT SHOWING ALL DEPOSITS, WITHDRAWALS, AND A CURRENT BALANCE, FROM ANY CORRECTIONAL FACILITY IN WHICH HE WAS CONFINED DURING THE TIME PERIOD FROM NOVEMBER 22, 2018 THROUGH MAY 22, 2019, ETC. IF CLARK FAILS TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER, THIS CASE MAY BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 5/31/19.5/31/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF.(er, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL filed by MARK ANTHONY CLARK..(jwl, ) Modified on 5/24/2019 (jwl, ).
May 22, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by MARK ANTHONY CLARK. (jwl, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (jwl, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against MARSHA DOE, JOHN DOE-HAWKINS, JOHN DOE-SERGEI, JOHN DOE-WALKER, JOHN DOE-WHITESIDE, EDWARD MCFADDEN, PRIME CARE-HEALTH CARE DEPARTMENT, GEORGE ROBERTS, filed by MARK ANTHONY CLARK. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jwl, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS filed by MARK ANTHONY CLARK..(jwl, ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 5/24/2019) (jwl, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CLARK et al v. DOE-WALKER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARSHA DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE-WALKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE-HAWKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRIME CARE-HEALTH CARE DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE-WHITESIDE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE-SERGEI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIRECTOR GEORGE ROBERTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARDEN EDWARD MCFADDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK ANTHONY CLARK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?