FRANCO v. AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY

Plaintiff: SUSAN FRANCO
Defendant: AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv02238
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: WENDY BEETLESTONE
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 Report Of Rule 26(F) Meeting and Proposed Discovery Plan (Joint) by AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (EINSIG, NATALIE)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CONFERENCE: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 7/29/2019 11:00 AM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE. (Attachments: #1 Electronic Discovery Order, #2 Joint Report and Discovery Plan)(amw, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by NATALIE GRILL EINSIG on behalf of AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY with Certificate of Service(EINSIG, NATALIE)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Aetna Life, Inc. with Certificate of Service by AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY.(DOWNEY, BRIAN)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY waiver sent on 5/29/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. (DOWNEY, BRIAN)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN P. DOWNEY on behalf of AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY with Certificate of Service(DOWNEY, BRIAN)
May 22, 2019 Summons Issued as to AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. 1 Forwarded To: Counsel on 5/23/2019 (ahf)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 197766.), filed by SUSAN FRANCO.(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FRANCO v. AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: BRIAN P. DOWNEY
Represented By: NATALIE GRILL EINSIG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN FRANCO
Represented By: MICHAEL J. PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?