INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 21 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND et al v. GLOBAL CONTRACTING AND PAINTING, INC.

Plaintiff: INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 21 INDUSTRY ADVANCEMENT FUND, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 21 JOB ORGANIZATION PROGRAM TRUST FUND, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 21 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 21, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 21 JOB RECOVERY FUND, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 21 SCHOLARSHIP FUND, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 21 VACATION FUND, FINISHING TRADES INSTITUTE OF THE MID-ATLANTIC REGION, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 21 ANNUITY FUND and JOSEPH ASHDALE
Defendant: GLOBAL CONTRACTING AND PAINTING, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02255
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by JOSEPH ASHDALE, FINISHING TRADES INSTITUTE OF THE MID-ATLANTIC REGION, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 21, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 21 ANNUITY FUND, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 21 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 21 INDUSTRY ADVANCEMENT FUND, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 21 JOB ORGANIZATION PROGRAM TRUST FUND, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 21 JOB RECOVERY FUND, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 21 SCHOLARSHIP FUND, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 21 VACATION FUND As To GLOBAL CONTRACTING AND PAINTING, INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MARTIN, SYRETTA)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFT SHALL HAVE AN EXTENSION OF TIME THROUGH & INCLUDING 7/8/2019 TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE PLEAD IN RESPONSE TO PLFFS' COMPLAINT, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 6/25/19. 6/25/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED TO PRO SE DEFT.(kw, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME by JOSEPH ASHDALE, FINISHING TRADES INSTITUTE OF THE MID-ATLANTIC REGION, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 21, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 21 ANNUITY FUND, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 21 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 21 INDUSTRY ADVANCEMENT FUND, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 21 JOB ORGANIZATION PROGRAM TRUST FUND, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 21 JOB RECOVERY FUND, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 21 SCHOLARSHIP FUND, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 21 VACATION FUND.**(FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY, COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL)** (MARTIN, SYRETTA) Modified on 6/21/2019 (tjd).
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 21 VACATION FUND, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 21 ANNUITY FUND, FINISHING TRADES INSTITUTE OF THE MID-ATLANTIC REGION, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 21 INDUSTRY ADVANCEMENT FUND, JOSEPH ASHDALE, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 21 JOB ORGANIZATION PROGRAM TRUST FUND, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 21 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 21 SCHOLARSHIP FUND, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 21, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 21 JOB RECOVERY FUND re: Jacqueline L. Balikowski served Summons and Complaint upon GLOBAL CONTRACTING AND PAINTING, INC.. GLOBAL CONTRACTING AND PAINTING, INC. served on 5/30/2019, answer due 6/20/2019. (MARTIN, SYRETTA)
May 23, 2019 Summons Issued as to GLOBAL CONTRACTING AND PAINTING, INC.. One Forwarded To: Counsel on 5/23/19 (jwl, )
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GLOBAL CONTRACTING AND PAINTING, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 197812.), filed by INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 21 VACATION FUND, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 21 ANNUITY FUND, FINISHING TRADES INSTITUTE OF THE MID-ATLANTIC REGION, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 21 INDUSTRY ADVANCEMENT FUND, JOSEPH ASHDALE, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 21 JOB ORGANIZATION PROGRAM TRUST FUND, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 21 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 21 SCHOLARSHIP FUND, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 21, INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 21 JOB RECOVERY FUND. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 21 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND et al v. GLOBAL CONTRACTING AND PAINTING, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 21 INDUSTRY ADVANCEMENT FUND
Represented By: SYRETTA J. MARTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 21 JOB ORGANIZATION PROGRAM TRUST FUND
Represented By: SYRETTA J. MARTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 21 HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND
Represented By: SYRETTA J. MARTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 21
Represented By: SYRETTA J. MARTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 21 JOB RECOVERY FUND
Represented By: SYRETTA J. MARTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 21 SCHOLARSHIP FUND
Represented By: SYRETTA J. MARTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 21 VACATION FUND
Represented By: SYRETTA J. MARTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FINISHING TRADES INSTITUTE OF THE MID-ATLANTIC REGION
Represented By: SYRETTA J. MARTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: INTERNATIONAL UNION OF PAINTERS AND ALLIED TRADES DISTRICT COUNCIL NO. 21 ANNUITY FUND
Represented By: SYRETTA J. MARTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH ASHDALE
Represented By: SYRETTA J. MARTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLOBAL CONTRACTING AND PAINTING, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?