ROBINSON v. LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE

Plaintiff: MICHAEL J. ROBINSON
Defendant: LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE
Case Number: 2:2019cv02286
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: R BARCLAY SURRICK
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER THAT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WITH MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI WILL BE SCHEDULED AT THE REQUEST OF COUNSEL. ALL FACT AND EXPERT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 11/13/2019. DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS SHALL BE FILED BY 12/13/2019. MOTIONS IN LIMINE SHALL BE FILED BY 1/16/2020. A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 2/20/2020, AT 2:00 PM, IN CHAMBERS. TRIAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 2/24/2020, AT 9:30 AM, IN COURTROOM 8-A. FURTHER INFORMATION AND DEADLINES OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 7/18/2019. 7/19/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
July 18, 2019 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK Initial Pretrial Conference held on 7/18/2019. (FILED IN ERROR; DUPLICATE FILING, SEE PAPER #11 ). (amas) Modified on 7/19/2019 (fb).
July 18, 2019 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK. An Initial Pretrial Conference was held on 7/18/19. (fdc)
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 Joint Case Report by MICHAEL J. ROBINSON. (DUFFY, DANIELLE) Modified on 7/16/2019 (fb).
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT E. SMITH on behalf of LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE with Certificate of Service(SMITH, ROBERT)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 7/18/2019 AT 11:30 AM IN CHAMBERS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 6/28/19. 6/28/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint together with with Affirmative Defenses by LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE.(FOSTER, WILLIAM)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Delaware County. (mbh, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by EILEEN MARGARET BRADLEY on behalf of LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE with Certificate of Service(BRADLEY, EILEEN)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT THE LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY MAY FILE AN ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES ON OR BEFORE 6/28/19. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 6/3/19. 6/3/19 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 STIPULATION for Extension of Time by LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE. (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL). (FOSTER, WILLIAM) Modified on 5/31/2019 (fb).
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent LMHC MASSACHUSETTS HOLDINGS INC. for LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE. with Certificate of Service by LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE.(ahf)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE from Delaware County Court of Common Pleas, case number 19-003512. Certificate of Service. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 197904)(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROBINSON v. LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL J. ROBINSON
Represented By: DANIELLE L. DUFFY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE
Represented By: WILLIAM C. FOSTER
Represented By: ROBERT E. SMITH
Represented By: EILEEN MARGARET BRADLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?