UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al v. BELL et al
Plaintiff: MATTHEW MULLER and UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: JENNIFER C. BELL and JAMES A. BELL
Case Number: 2:2019cv02437
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: BERLE M SCHILLER
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7604a
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT TO MOVE THE HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS RULE TO SHOW CAUSE IN THIS MATTER FROM 7/8/19 AT 10:00 TO 8/26/19; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 7/8/19. 7/9/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER CONFERENCE held on 7/8/19. Court Reporter: ESR. (jl, )
July 5, 2019 Filing 6 Stipulation to Continue Hearing on Rule Returnable Date Stipulated By Parties filed by JAMES A. BELL, JENNIFER C. BELL. (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL).(DAUGHERTY, RONALD) Modified on 7/8/2019 (fb).
July 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by RONALD L. DAUGHERTY on behalf of JAMES A. BELL, JENNIFER C. BELL (DAUGHERTY, RONALD)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Matthew Muller re: served Proof of Service upon James A. Bell by Hand Delivery on 06/17/2019 (HUGHES, BRYAN)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Matthew Muller re: served Proof of Service upon Jennifer C. Bell by Hand Delivery on 06/17/2019 (HUGHES, BRYAN)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER THAT THE UNITED STATES SHALL SERVE COPIES OF THIS ORDER, THE COMPLAINT AND EXHIBITS UPON DEFENDANTS JAMES A. BELL AND JENNIFER BELL WITHIN 14 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER. DEFENDANTS SHALL APPEAR BEFORE THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA ON 7/8/19 AT 10:00 AND SHOW CAUSE WHY AN ORDER SHOULD NOT BE ENTERED ENFORCING THE INTERNAL REVENUE SUMMONSES SERVED UPON THEM ON 11/7/18 AND 11/8/18; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 6/11/19. 6/11/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Enforce IRS Summons, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, MATTHEW MULLER.(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA et al v. BELL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JENNIFER C. BELL
Represented By: RONALD L. DAUGHERTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES A. BELL
Represented By: RONALD L. DAUGHERTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW MULLER
Represented By: BRYAN C. HUGHES
Represented By: GREGORY B. DAVID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: BRYAN C. HUGHES
Represented By: GREGORY B. DAVID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?