STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC v. JOHN DOE

Plaintiff: STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Case Number: 2:2019cv02478
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CYNTHIA M RUFE
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE THIRD PARTY SUBPOENAS PRIOR TO A RULE 26(F) CONFERENCE (DOC. NO. #3 ) IS GRANTED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 6/20/2019.6/21/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 First MOTION for Discovery Seeking Leave To Serve A Third Party Subpoena Prior To A Rule 26(f) Conference filed by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC.Memorandum of Law, Declaration(s), Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A -- Declaration of Greg Lansky, #3 Exhibit B -- Declaration of Tobias Fieser, #4 Exhibit C -- Declaration of John S. Pasquale, #5 Exhibit D -- Declaration of Susan B. Stalzer, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(ATKIN, JOHN)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including GENERAL MEDIA SYSTEMS, LLC by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC.(ATKIN, JOHN)
June 5, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC. (ahf)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 198549.), filed by STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation Form, #4 Case Management Track Form)(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC v. JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STRIKE 3 HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: JOHN C. ATKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?