Corbin v. Corbin et al
Plaintiff: Kymere Corbin
Defendant: C/O JENKINS, Julio M. Corbin, MR. PARKS, JULIO M. ALGARIN, C.O. COLLINS and POLICE OFFICER GREGG
Case Number: 2:2019cv02480
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MITCHELL S GOLDBERG
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDERED THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED; PLAINTIFF SHALL PAY THE FULL FILING FEE OF $350.00 IN INSTALLMENTS; THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SEND A COPY OF THIS ORDER TO THE SUPERINTENDENT OF SCI RETREAT; THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED AND DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ALL CLAIMS ASSERTED AGAINST DEFENDANT JULIO M. ALGARIN; PLAINTIFF IS GIVEN THIRTY (30) DAYS TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT; UPON THE FILING OF AN AMENDED COMPLAINT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL NOT MAKE SERVICE UNTIL SO ORDERED BY THE COURT; THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SEND A BLANK COPY OF THIS COURT'S CURRENT STANDARD FORM FOR FILILNG A PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT BEARING THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CIVIL ACTION NUMBER; IF PLAINTIFF FAILS TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT HIS CASE WILL PROCEED BASED ON HIS AMENDED COMPLAINT AGAISNT THE OTHER NAMED DEFENDANTS ONLY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 6/17/19. 6/18/19 ENTERED AND COPY OF ORDER AND FORMS MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF.(jpd, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG ON 6/17/19. 6/18/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF.(jpd, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 12 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (ahf)
June 7, 2019 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Middle; Case Number 1:19-cv-00628. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: 1. The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this action tothe USDC for the ED of PA.2. Any decision with respect to Pltfs mtn to proceed ifp #2 will be deferredto the transferee court.3. Any decision with respect to Pltfs mtn to amend #7 will be deferred to the transferee court.4. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case.Signed by Honorable Sylvia H. Rambo on 6/5/19. (ma) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/7/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 U.S. MARSHAL - 285, AO 398 and AO 399 Service Forms Completed by Plaintiff. (ao) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/7/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Collins, Gregg, Jenkins, Parks, Julio M. Algarin, filed by Kymere Corbin.(ao) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/7/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint by Kymere Corbin.(ao) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/7/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 Monthly Account Statement filed on behalf of Kymere Corbin. (ao) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/7/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from LP directing plaintiff to complete his IFP application, including a certified statement of his inmate account. (lp) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/7/2019.]
April 12, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Original paperwork forwarded by Scranton Clerk's Office. (aaa) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/7/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER (Attachments: #1 285 Service Packet with IFP Notice)(aaa) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/7/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (aaa) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/7/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 (Partial) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kymere Corbin.(aaa) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/7/2019.]
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Kymere Corbin.(aaa) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Middle on 6/7/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corbin v. Corbin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kymere Corbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O JENKINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julio M. Corbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MR. PARKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JULIO M. ALGARIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. COLLINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POLICE OFFICER GREGG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?