LAUTZ v. STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: MARTIN LAUTZ
Defendant: FRAN MAZZA and STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv02481
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GENE EK PRATTER
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY Memorandum of Law to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand filed by MARTIN LAUTZ. (CHACKER, BRIAN) Modified on 7/15/2019 (tjd).
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER THAT MOTION (DOC. 8) IS GRANTED. IF THE COURT DENIES THE MOTION TO REMAND PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE A RESPONSE TO THE MOTION TO DISMISS WITHIN 21 DAYS FROM THAT RULING. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 7/10/19. 7/11/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing: INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED FOR 10/9/2019 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM BEFORE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER.(rab, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #7 MOTION to Remand : MOTION HEARING SET FOR 10/9/2019 10:00 AM IN COURTROOM BEFORE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER.(rab, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand filed by FRAN MAZZA, STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY. (MILLER, LORI)
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST to Defer Briefing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by MARTIN LAUTZ. (CHACKER, BRIAN) Modified on 6/25/2019 (md).
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand filed by MARTIN LAUTZ.Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service, Order.(CHACKER, BRIAN)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF HEARING: AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 10/1/2019 AT 11:00 AM IN CHAMBERS (ROOM 10613) BEFORE THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement)(sfl, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 Arbitration Certification that case exceeds the sum of $150,000.00 exclusive of interest and costs (CHACKER, BRIAN)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by FRAN MAZZA, STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY.Memorandum and Certificate of Service.(MILLER, LORI)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by FRAN MAZZA, STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY. (MILLER, LORI)
June 7, 2019 Case Eligible for Arbitration(jwl, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY.(jwl, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FRAN MAZZA, STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY from Common Pleas Philadelphia, case number 190500761. Certificate of Service. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 198544)(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LAUTZ v. STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRAN MAZZA
Represented By: LORI C. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: LORI C. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARTIN LAUTZ
Represented By: BRIAN S. CHACKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?