IN RE: SHERRY-LEE MCAULIFFE
Trustee: UNITED STATES TRUSTEE and WILLIAM C. MILLER
Appellant: SHERRY-LEE MCAULIFFE
Case Number: 2:2019cv02492
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: WENDY BEETLESTONE
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy: Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT THIS APPEAL IS DISMISSED, AND THE MATTER IS REMANDED TO THE CLERK OF THE UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 7/15/19. 7/16/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PARTIES AND E-MAILED. (va, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 Original Bankruptcy record received together with notice from Bankruptcy Court that the designation of the record on appeal has not been filed. (Attachments: #1 Original Record)(ahf)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (ahf)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 Certificate of Appeal of SHERRY-LEE MCAULIFFE from the order of Bankruptcy Chief Judge Magdeline D. Coleman filed on 5/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Appeal, Order, Docket Sheets, #2 Civil Cover Sheets)(ahf) Modified on 6/13/2019 (md).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE: SHERRY-LEE MCAULIFFE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: UNITED STATES TRUSTEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: WILLIAM C. MILLER
Represented By: WILLIAM C. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: SHERRY-LEE MCAULIFFE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?