THE FLYNN COMPANY v. EASTERN METAL RECYCLING - TERMINAL, LLC
Plaintiff: THE FLYNN COMPANY
Defendant: EASTERN METAL RECYCLING - TERMINAL, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv02495
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOHN R PADOVA
Referring Judge: JOSHUA D WOLSON
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings , Certificate of Service filed by EASTERN METAL RECYCLING - TERMINAL, LLC. (BELLI, ANDREW)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by THE FLYNN COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Request for Oral Argument, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Memorandum, #5 Exhibit A)(REILLY, THOMAS)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT PLFF SHALL RESPOND TO DEFT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS ON OR BEFORE 7/30/2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 7/19/19. 7/22/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by EASTERN METAL RECYCLING - TERMINAL, LLC.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(BELLI, ANDREW)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by EASTERN METAL RECYCLING - TERMINAL, LLC. Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A -- Agreement, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B -- June 2016 Extension, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C -- April 2018 Letter, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D -- July 2018 Letter, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E -- October 2018 Letter, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F -- Writ of Summons Filing, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G -- Discontinuance With Prejudice, #8 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(BELLI, ANDREW) Modified on 7/9/2019 (tjd).
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA TO HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 06/28/2019. 06/28/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(nd, )
June 7, 2019 Summons Issued as to EASTERN METAL RECYCLING - TERMINAL, LLC. One Forwarded To: Counsel on 6/10/19 (jwl, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by THE FLYNN COMPANY.(jwl, )
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EASTERN METAL RECYCLING - TERMINAL, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 198606.), filed by THE FLYNN COMPANY.(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THE FLYNN COMPANY v. EASTERN METAL RECYCLING - TERMINAL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EASTERN METAL RECYCLING - TERMINAL, LLC
Represented By: ANDREW J. BELLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE FLYNN COMPANY
Represented By: THOMAS F. REILLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?