SHERER v. FEDERATED MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: JEFFREY SHERER
Defendant: FEDERATED MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv02530
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JAN E DUBOIS
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION to Remand filed by FEDERATED MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Morales Complaint)(BROWN, TIFFANY)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF TIFFANY M. BROWN, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LRCP 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 6/24/19.6/26/19 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF CHARLES E. SPEVACEK, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LRCP 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 6/24/19.6/26/19 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Tiffany M. Brown ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13620619.) filed by FEDERATED MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY.Certificate of Service.(MISCIOSCIA, ANTHONY)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Charles E. Spevacek ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13620560.) filed by FEDERATED MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY.Certificate of Service.(MISCIOSCIA, ANTHONY)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERATED MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY.(MISCIOSCIA, ANTHONY)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Remand filed by JEFFREY SHERER.Memorandum, Certificate of Service and Certification. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum, #3 Certificate of Service and certification, #4 Exhibit A)(HAGGERTY, JAMES)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FEDERATED MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY from Philadelphia Court of Common Pleas, case number 190502153. Certificate of Service. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 198805)(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHERER v. FEDERATED MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY SHERER
Represented By: SCOTT B. COOPER
Represented By: JAMES C. HAGGERTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERATED MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: KONRAD KREBS
Represented By: ANTHONY L. MISCIOSCIA
Represented By: TIFFANY M. BROWN
Represented By: CHARLES E. SPEVACEK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?