LATIF v. SHOPRUNNER, INC.

Plaintiff: PAULA LATIF
Defendant: SHOPRUNNER, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02540
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by SEAN R. CAULFIELD on behalf of SHOPRUNNER, INC. (CAULFIELD, SEAN)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF SUSAN LORENC, ESQ. TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LRCP 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 7/29/19.7/29/19 ENTERED & COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED. COPY OF ECF APPLICATION MAILED TO LORENC. (fdc)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Susan Lorenc filed by SHOPRUNNER, INC..Certificate of Service.(FITZPATRICK, A.) (FILING FEE PAID) Modified 7/18/19 (fdc).
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT A PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 10/3/19 AT 2:00 PM BEFORE HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO. SIGNED BY HONORABLE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 7/16/19. 7/17/19 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Alibaba Group Holding Ltd with Certificate of Service by SHOPRUNNER, INC..(FITZPATRICK, A.)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by SHOPRUNNER, INC. Jury Demand, Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service.(FITZPATRICK, A.) Modified on 7/15/2019 (tjd).
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by PAULA LATIF re: Darryl Jones served Summons and Complaint upon SHOPRUNNER, INC. by service of corporation - person in charge. SHOPRUNNER, INC. served on 6/18/2019, answer due 7/9/2019. (ABRAMSON, ANDREW)
June 11, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by PAULA LATIF. (ahf)
June 11, 2019 Summons Issued as to SHOPRUNNER, INC. 1 Forwarded To: Counsel on 6/12/2019 (ahf)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SHOPRUNNER, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 198810.), filed by PAULA LATIF. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LATIF v. SHOPRUNNER, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAULA LATIF
Represented By: ANDREW S. ABRAMSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHOPRUNNER, INC.
Represented By: A. KLAIR FITZPATRICK
Represented By: SEAN R. CAULFIELD
Represented By: SUSAN LORENC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?