O'ROURKE v. COUNTY OF DELAWARE
Plaintiff: ROSEMARIE O'ROURKE
Defendant: COUNTY OF DELAWARE
Case Number: 2:2019cv02550
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GENE EK PRATTER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF HEARING: AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 10/3/2019 AT 11:00 AM IN CHAMBERS (ROOM 10613) BEFORE THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement)(sfl, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by MARK DANIEL SCHWARTZ on behalf of ROSEMARIE O'ROURKE with jury dem. & cert of svc(SCHWARTZ, MARK)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ROSEMARIE O'ROURKE. COUNTY OF DELAWARE waiver sent on 6/25/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. (PEARLMAN, JASON)
June 12, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ROSEMARIE O'ROURKE. (ahf)
June 12, 2019 Summons Issued as to COUNTY OF DELAWARE. 1 Forwarded To: Counsel on 6/12/2019 (ahf)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COUNTY OF DELAWARE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 198824.), filed by ROSEMARIE O'ROURKE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheets)(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'ROURKE v. COUNTY OF DELAWARE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSEMARIE O'ROURKE
Represented By: JASON L. PEARLMAN
Represented By: MARK DANIEL SCHWARTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNTY OF DELAWARE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?