KANNEH v. PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY

Plaintiff: YAHAYAH KANNEH
Defendant: PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv02552
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JUAN R SANCHEZ
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 7/12/19. 7/12/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, )
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE RESPONSE TO #3 MOTION TO PARTIALLY DISMISS BY 7/15/2019, ETC. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 7/8/19. 7/8/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY.Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(DAPPER, KATHLEEN)
June 14, 2019 Case Eligible for Arbitration(jwl, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, Corporate Parent DRIVE INSURANCE HOLDINGS, INC. for PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY. by PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY.(mbh, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal filed by PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY from Philadelphia County Court of Common Pleas, Case Number 190501165 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE198851), Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Coversheet, #2 Case Management Track, #3 Designation Form)(mbh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KANNEH v. PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: DANIEL J. TWILLA
Represented By: KATHLEEN PATRICIA DAPPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YAHAYAH KANNEH
Represented By: BRAD COOPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?