DUNHAM v. DELOITTE LLP
Plaintiff: JOANNE DUNHAM
Defendant: DELOITTE L.L.P.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02554
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Deloitte LLP with Certificate of Service by DELOITTE L.L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(LEE, WONHO)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by DELOITTE L.L.P..Memorandum of Law, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(LEE, WONHO)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING THE DEFENDANT AN EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TI FILE AN ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT UNTIL AUGUST 9, 2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 07/09/2019. 07/09/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nds)
June 20, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Adam Golden re: served Complaint, Summons upon Donna Snow by Serving an Authorized Person on 06/19/2019 (KOLMAN, TIMOTHY)
June 12, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by JOANNE DUNHAM. (ahf)
June 12, 2019 Summons Issued as to DELOITTE L.L.P. 1 Forwarded To: Counsel on 6/12/2019 (ahf)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DELOITTE L.L.P. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-13601822.), filed by Joanne Dunham. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form, #4 Summons)(KOLMAN, TIMOTHY) Modified on 6/12/2019 (afm, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DUNHAM v. DELOITTE LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOANNE DUNHAM
Represented By: TIMOTHY M. KOLMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DELOITTE L.L.P.
Represented By: WONHO JOHN LEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?