ROGERS v. SMITH VOLKSWAGEN, LTD.
Plaintiff: AALIYAH ROGERS
Defendant: SMITH VOLKSWAGEN, LTD.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02567
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: ANITA B BRODY
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing:A RULE 16 CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 10/15/2019 AT 11:00 AM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS, ROOM 7613 ON THE 7TH FLOOR OF THE U.S. COURTHOUSE, 601 MARKET ST., PHILADELPHIA, PA, BEFORE HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY.8/7/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF.(mo, )
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by SMITH VOLKSWAGEN, LTD..Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(AYES, MITCHELL) (Main Document 7 replaced on 8/9/2019) (tjd, ).
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - UPON CONSIDERATION OF DEFENDANT SMITH VOLKSWAGEN LTD'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD, AND ALL OTHER SUBMISSIONS, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED... MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER... IS GRANTED.... DEFENDANT'S DEADLINE TO RESPOND TOPLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED TO AUGUST 5, 2019.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 7/15/2019.7/15/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES VIA ECF.(mo, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by SMITH VOLKSWAGEN, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(AYES, MITCHELL)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead filed by SMITH VOLKSWAGEN, LTD..CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(AYES, MITCHELL)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by KEVIN J. KOTCH on behalf of AALIYAH ROGERS with Certificate of Service(KOTCH, KEVIN)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AALIYAH ROGERS re: MARTIN ETTORE served Summons and Complaint upon SMITH VOLKSWAGEN, LTD. by PERSONAL SERVICE. SMITH VOLKSWAGEN, LTD. served on 6/14/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. (jl, )
June 13, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by AALIYAH ROGERS. (jwl, )
June 13, 2019 Summons Issued as to SMITH VOLKSWAGEN, LTD.. One Forwarded To: Counsel on 6/13/19 (jwl, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SMITH VOLKSWAGEN, LTD. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 198880.), filed by AALIYAH ROGERS.(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROGERS v. SMITH VOLKSWAGEN, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AALIYAH ROGERS
Represented By: RICHARD H. KIM
Represented By: KEVIN J. KOTCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMITH VOLKSWAGEN, LTD.
Represented By: MITCHELL AYES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?