ROMANCHICK v. STATE FARM MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER ROMANCHICK
Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv02571
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOEL H SLOMSKY
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT COUNT I OF PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT IS HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 7/31/19. 7/31/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION TO DISMISS COUNT 1 OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT WITHI PREJUDICE by STATE FARM MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (DOUGLAS, KATHERINE)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT COUNTS II & III OF PLFF'S COMPLAINT IN THE ABOVE MATTER ARE HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AS PLFF INTENDS TO ONLY PROCEED IN THE ABOVE CAPTIONED MATTER WITH A BREACH OF CONTRACT CLAIM AGAINST STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 7/19/19. 7/22/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION to Dismiss Counts II and III of Plaintiff's Complaint With Prejudice by STATE FARM MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (DOUGLAS, KATHERINE)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHEN J. DEVINE on behalf of CHRISTOPHER ROMANCHICK with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(DEVINE, STEPHEN)
June 13, 2019 Case Eligible for Arbitration(jwl, )
June 13, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by STATE FARM MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (jl, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by STATE FARM MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY.(jl, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by STATE FARM MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY from PHILADELPHIA COURT OF COMMON PLEAS, case number 190500607. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE198887)(jl, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/13/2019: #1 CASE FORMS) (jl, ). Modified on 6/17/2019 (md).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROMANCHICK v. STATE FARM MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: KATHERINE COLE DOUGLAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER ROMANCHICK
Represented By: JARED SCOTT ZAFRAN
Represented By: STEPHEN J. DEVINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?