ROMANO v. TRANS UNION, LLC et al
Plaintiff: MARIE ROMANO
Defendant: EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, TRANS UNION, LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. and CHASE CARDHOLDER SERVICES, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02627
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Experian plc with certificate of service by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC..(GHIASUDDIN, MOHAMMAD)
August 12, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint together with affirmative defenses, certificate of service by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC..(GHIASUDDIN, MOHAMMAD)
July 12, 2019 Filing 12 TRANS UNION, LLC'S ANSWER to Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by TRANS UNION, LLC.(BROWN, WILLIAM)
July 11, 2019 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Equifax Inc. by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC.(KLEIN, JONATHAN)
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint together with Defenses by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC.(KLEIN, JONATHAN)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING THE DEFENDANT, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. AN EXTENSION OF TIME IN WHICH TO FILE AN ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT UNTIL AUGUST 12, 2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 07/10/2019. 07/10/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nds)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MARIE ROMANO re: Ryan Flaska served Summons and Complaint upon EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. by personal service. EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. served on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. (VULLINGS, BRENT)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO ADMIT #5 IS GRANTED AND WILLIAM R. BROWN, ESQUIRE IS HEREBY ADMITTED AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT TRANS UNION, LLC, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDUARDO C. ROBRENO ON 07/01/2019. 07/02/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nds)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. and TransUnion with Certificate of Service by TRANS UNION, LLC.(GREEN, CASEY)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of William R. Brown, Esquire by TRANS UNION, LLC. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13639073.). (GREEN, CASEY)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MARIE ROMANO re: Christopher Todd Horton served Summons and Complaint upon EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC by personal service. EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC served on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. (VULLINGS, BRENT)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MARIE ROMANO re: D'Wayne Henriksson served Summons and Complaint upon TRANS UNION, LLC by personal service. TRANS UNION, LLC served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. (VULLINGS, BRENT)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by MARIE ROMANO re: William Cooper served Summons and Complaint upon CHASE CARDHOLDER SERVICES, INC. by personal service. CHASE CARDHOLDER SERVICES, INC. served on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. (VULLINGS, BRENT)
June 17, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by MARIE ROMANO. (jwl, )
June 17, 2019 Summons Issued as to CHASE CARDHOLDER SERVICES, INC., EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., TRANS UNION, LLC. Four Forwarded To: Counsel on 6/18/19 (jwl, )
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CHASE CARDHOLDER SERVICES, INC., EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., TRANS UNION, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-13612438.), filed by MARIE ROMANO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form)(VULLINGS, BRENT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROMANO v. TRANS UNION, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: JONATHAN D. KLEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRANS UNION, LLC
Represented By: WILLIAM R. BROWN
Represented By: CASEY GREEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.
Represented By: MOHAMMAD A. GHIASUDDIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHASE CARDHOLDER SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIE ROMANO
Represented By: BRENT F. VULLINGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?