MERCER et al v. ARAMARK CORPORATION

Plaintiff: MICHAEL MERCER and LEO FORD
Defendant: ARAMARK CORPORATION
Case Number: 2:2019cv02762
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JAN E DUBOIS
Referring Judge: JOHN R PADOVA
Nature of Suit: Contract: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by MARK B. DESANTO on behalf of LEO FORD, MICHAEL MERCER (DESANTO, MARK)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA TO HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 08/07/2019. 08/07/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nd, )
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT ARAMARK CORPORATION ANSWER BY 8/1/2019. ADDITIONAL DEADLINES OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 8/1/19. 8/1/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by SAMANTHA E. JONES on behalf of LEO FORD, MICHAEL MERCER (JONES, SAMANTHA)
June 21, 2019 Demand for Trial by Jury (mbh, )
June 21, 2019 (1) Summons Issued as to ARAMARK CORPORATION. Forwarded To: counsel on 6/25/19 (mbh, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against ARAMARK CORPORATION (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE199388) filed by MICHAEL MERCER and LEO FORD. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4, #4 Part 5, #5 Part 6)(mbh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MERCER et al v. ARAMARK CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARAMARK CORPORATION
Represented By: MICHAEL JONATHAN PUMA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL MERCER
Represented By: STEVEN A. SCHWARTZ
Represented By: MARK B. DESANTO
Represented By: SAMANTHA E. HOLBROOK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEO FORD
Represented By: STEVEN A. SCHWARTZ
Represented By: MARK B. DESANTO
Represented By: SAMANTHA E. HOLBROOK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?