ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY v. THREESIXTY BRANDS GROUP, LLC et al
Plaintiff: ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: MERCHSOURCE, LLC, THREESIXTY BRANDS GROUP, LLC, HOMEDICS-U.S.A., INC., TSIC, INC. and JOHN DOES #1-10
Case Number: 2:2019cv02790
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: BERLE M SCHILLER
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY re: George Sano served Summons and Complaint upon MERCHSOURCE, LLC by Personal Service. MERCHSOURCE, LLC served on 7/11/2019, answer due 8/1/2019. (MCGLYNN, JOSEPH)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY re: Robert Lutren served Summons and Complaint upon HOMEDICS-U.S.A., INC. by Personal Service. HOMEDICS-U.S.A., INC. served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. (MCGLYNN, JOSEPH)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY re: Kendra Watson served Summons and Complaint upon THREESIXTY BRANDS GROUP, LLC by Personal Service. THREESIXTY BRANDS GROUP, LLC served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. (MCGLYNN, JOSEPH)
July 1, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (ahf)
June 26, 2019 Summons Issued as to HOMEDICS-U.S.A., INC., MERCHSOURCE, LLC, THREESIXTY BRANDS GROUP, LLC, TSIC, INC. 4 Forwarded To: Counsel on 7/1/2019 (ahf)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HOMEDICS-U.S.A., INC., JOHN DOES #1-10, MERCHSOURCE, LLC, THREESIXTY BRANDS GROUP, LLC, TSIC, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-13632604.), filed by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY.(MCGLYNN, JOSEPH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY v. THREESIXTY BRANDS GROUP, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERCHSOURCE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THREESIXTY BRANDS GROUP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOMEDICS-U.S.A., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TSIC, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES #1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: JOSEPH L. MCGLYNN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?