BOWERS v. AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC. et al
Plaintiff: SHARON MURRAY BOWERS
Defendant: AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC. and AMERICAN AIRLINES GROUP, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02795
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: WENDY BEETLESTONE
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF CONFERENCE: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 9/5/2019 02:30 PM IN JUDGES CHAMBERS 10614 BEFORE HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE. (Attachments: #1 Electronic Discovery Order, #2 Joint Report and Discovery Plan)(amw, )
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by AMERICAN AIRLINES GROUP, INC..(MILLS, CRAIG)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including American Airlines Group, Inc. with Certificate of Service by AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC..(MILLS, CRAIG)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by AMERICAN AIRLINES GROUP, INC., AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC. Jury Demand, Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service.(MILLS, CRAIG) Modified on 7/30/2019 (tjd).
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by LUKE E. MCDANIELS on behalf of AMERICAN AIRLINES GROUP, INC., AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC. with Certificate of Service(MCDANIELS, LUKE)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by CRAIG DOUGLAS MILLS on behalf of AMERICAN AIRLINES GROUP, INC., AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC. with Certificate of Service(MILLS, CRAIG)
June 26, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by SHARON MURRAY BOWERS. (jwl, )
June 26, 2019 Summons Issued as to AMERICAN AIRLINES GROUP, INC., AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC.. Two Forwarded To: Counsel on 6/26/19 (jwl, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AMERICAN AIRLINES GROUP, INC., AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 199476.), filed by SHARON MURRAY BOWERS.(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BOWERS v. AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHARON MURRAY BOWERS
Represented By: MICHAEL A. CIANCI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC.
Represented By: LUKE E. MCDANIELS
Represented By: CRAIG DOUGLAS MILLS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN AIRLINES GROUP, INC.
Represented By: LUKE E. MCDANIELS
Represented By: CRAIG DOUGLAS MILLS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?