STAROPOLI et al v. METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: SUSAN STAROPOLI and AVA STAROPOLI
Defendant: JP MORGAN CHASE, METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY and JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02850
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GENE EK PRATTER
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service by Joshua Lee re: served Summons & Complaint upon Nora Dindyal, authorized to receive by Personal Service on 8/13/2019 (COHEN, FAYE)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT METLIFE TO FILE AN ANSWER, A MOTION UNDER RULE 12(b), OR OTHER RESPONSE TO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED TO SEPTEMBER 6, 2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 8/22/19. 8/23/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rab, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answer (GRIFFITH, JAMES) Modified on 8/16/2019 (lvj, ). (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTORNEY; FORWARD TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL)
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES LEWIS GRIFFITH, JR on behalf of METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY with Certificate of Service(GRIFFITH, JAMES)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service by V. Enrique Mendez re: served Summons & Complaint upon Gabriela Sanchez, Person Authorized to Receive by Personal Service on 7/25/2019 (COHEN, FAYE)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE; granting #3 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE FOR PLAINTIFFS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 7/19/19.7/19/19- ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rab, )
July 18, 2019 2 Summons Issued as to JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. Forwarded To: FAYE RIVA COHEN on 7/18/19 (fdc, ) Modified on 7/19/2019 (fb).
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, filed by SUSAN STAROPOLI, AVA STAROPOLI.(fdc, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF HEARING: AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/3/2019 AT 3:00 PM IN CHAMBERS (ROOM 10613) BEFORE THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement)(sfl, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Robert J. McKennon ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13674502.) filed by AVA STAROPOLI, SUSAN STAROPOLI.Declaration, Certificate of Service.(COHEN, FAYE)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Nicholas A. West ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-13674458.) filed by AVA STAROPOLI, SUSAN STAROPOLI.Declaration, Certificate of Service.(COHEN, FAYE) Modified 7/17/19 (fdc).
June 28, 2019 Summons Issued as to JP MORGAN CHASE, METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. 2 Forwarded To: Counsel on 6/28/2019 (ahf)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JP MORGAN CHASE, METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 199655.), filed by SUSAN STAROPOLI, AVA STAROPOLI.(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STAROPOLI et al v. METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN STAROPOLI
Represented By: FAYE RIVA COHEN
Represented By: ROBERT J. MCKENNON
Represented By: NICHOLAS A. WEST
Represented By: BRIAN M. DOYLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AVA STAROPOLI
Represented By: FAYE RIVA COHEN
Represented By: ROBERT J. MCKENNON
Represented By: NICHOLAS A. WEST
Represented By: BRIAN M. DOYLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP MORGAN CHASE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: JAMES LEWIS GRIFFITH, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?