STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO. v. PECO ENERGY COMPANY
Plaintiff: STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO.
Defendant: PECO ENERGY COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv02884
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GENE EK PRATTER
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 11 Letter to The Honorable Gene E.K. Pratter re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO.. (DE LUCA, DANIEL) Modified on 8/29/2019 (lisad, ).
August 28, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY Memorandum of Law in Further Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by PECO ENERGY COMPANY. Certificate of Service. (YOUNG, THERESA) Modified on 8/29/2019 (lisad, ).
August 21, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(DE LUCA, DANIEL)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by PECO ENERGY COMPANY.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(YOUNG, THERESA)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT UNTIL AUGUST 20, 2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 7/24/19. 7/24/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rab, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Exelon Corporation with Certificate of Service by PECO ENERGY COMPANY.(YOUNG, THERESA)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH A. RICCHEZZA on behalf of PECO ENERGY COMPANY with Certificate of Service(RICCHEZZA, JOSEPH)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by THERESA YOUNG on behalf of PECO ENERGY COMPANY with Certificate of Service(YOUNG, THERESA)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO. re: Jeffrey Nugent served Summons and Complaint upon PECO ENERGY COMPANY by Personal Service. PECO ENERGY COMPANY served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019. (DE LUCA, DANIEL)
July 2, 2019 Case Eligible for Arbitration(ahf)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent STATE FARM INSURANCE COMPANIES for STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO.. by STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO..(ahf)
July 2, 2019 Summons Issued as to PECO ENERGY COMPANY. 1 Forwarded To: Counsel on 7/2/2019 (ahf)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PECO ENERGY COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 199841.), filed by STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO..(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO. v. PECO ENERGY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PECO ENERGY COMPANY
Represented By: JOSEPH A. RICCHEZZA
Represented By: THERESA YOUNG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY CO.
Represented By: DANIEL J. DE LUCA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?