PRESTON v. HOWELL et al
Plaintiff: SAMUEL DAVID PRESTON
Defendant: ADVISE LABORATORIES, INC. and JOHN SCOTT HOWELL
Case Number: 2:2019cv02974
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JUAN R SANCHEZ
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 Minute Entry/Report of Rule 16 Conference for proceedings held before CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ in Courtroom 14B on 8/21/19. (kw, )
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT DISCOVERY DUE BY 12/2/2019. DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS DUE BY 1/13/2020. A TELECONFERENCE TO DISCUSS SETTLEMENT SHALL TAKE PLACE ON 2/3/2020 AT 3:00 P.M.. MOTIONS IN LIMINE DUE BY 2/19/2020. PLAINTIFF'S PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 3/4/2020. DEFENDANT'S PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 3/4/2020. FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 3/9/2020 AT 2:00 P.M. IN COURTROOM 14B. TRIAL POOL SET FOR 3/16/2020. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 8/21/19. 8/22/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT A RULE 16 CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD IN THE ABOVE CAPTIONED MATTER ON 8/21/19 AT 3:30 P.M.; ETC.. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 8/7/19. 8/8/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint together with With Affirmative Defenses by ADVISE LABORATORIES, INC., JOHN SCOTT HOWELL.(WALTO, CATHERINE)
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID SAMUEL JAFFE on behalf of SAMUEL DAVID PRESTON (JAFFE, DAVID)
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by CATHERINE N. WALTO on behalf of ADVISE LABORATORIES, INC., JOHN SCOTT HOWELL with Certificate of Service(WALTO, CATHERINE)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN H. MCCARTHY on behalf of ADVISE LABORATORIES, INC., JOHN SCOTT HOWELL with Certificate of Service(MCCARTHY, JOHN)
July 9, 2019 Summons Issued as to ADVISE LABORATORIES, INC., JOHN SCOTT HOWELL. Forwarded To: Gregory Creed Littman, Esq. on 7/9/19 (fdc, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ADVISE LABORATORIES, INC., JOHN SCOTT HOWELL ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 200160.), filed by SAMUEL DAVID PRESTON.(fdc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PRESTON v. HOWELL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADVISE LABORATORIES, INC.
Represented By: CATHERINE N. WALTO
Represented By: JOHN H. MCCARTHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN SCOTT HOWELL
Represented By: CATHERINE N. WALTO
Represented By: JOHN H. MCCARTHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAMUEL DAVID PRESTON
Represented By: GREGORY CREED LITTMAN
Represented By: DAVID SAMUEL JAFFE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?