KULAKOV v. ION TRADING, INC. et al
Plaintiff: ALEXANDER KULAKOV
Defendant: TRIPLE POINT TECHNOLOGY, INC. and ION TRADING, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02977
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: R BARCLAY SURRICK
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Triple Point Intermediate Holdings, Inc.; ION Trading UK Limited with Certificate of Service by ION TRADING, INC., TRIPLE POINT TECHNOLOGY, INC..(PICKELL, JARED)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ALEXANDER KULAKOV. TRIPLE POINT TECHNOLOGY, INC. waiver sent on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (SCHIFF, LANE)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ALEXANDER KULAKOV. ION TRADING, INC. waiver sent on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (SCHIFF, LANE)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by JARED PICKELL on behalf of ION TRADING, INC., TRIPLE POINT TECHNOLOGY, INC. with Certificate of Service(PICKELL, JARED)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by LARRY BESNOFF on behalf of ION TRADING, INC., TRIPLE POINT TECHNOLOGY, INC. with Certificate of Service(BESNOFF, LARRY)
July 9, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ALEXANDER KULAKOV. (jwl, )
July 9, 2019 Summons Issued as to ION TRADING, INC., TRIPLE POINT TECHNOLOGY, INC.. Two Forwarded To: Counsel on 7/9/19 (jwl, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ION TRADING, INC., TRIPLE POINT TECHNOLOGY, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-13656176.), filed by ALEXANDER KULAKOV.(SCHIFF, LANE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KULAKOV v. ION TRADING, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEXANDER KULAKOV
Represented By: LANE SCHIFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRIPLE POINT TECHNOLOGY, INC.
Represented By: JARED PICKELL
Represented By: LARRY BESNOFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ION TRADING, INC.
Represented By: JARED PICKELL
Represented By: LARRY BESNOFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?