COLE v. LUITPOLD PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: ROBERT COLE
Defendant: DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO, INC., VIFOR PHARMACEUTICALS MANAGEMENT LTD., AMERICAN REGENT, INC., DAIICHI SANKYO US HOLDINGS, INC. and LUITPOLD PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02983
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: WENDY BEETLESTONE
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2020 Filing 20 Report Of JOINT RULE 26(F) REPORT by AMERICAN REGENT, INC., DAIICHI SANKYO US HOLDINGS, INC., DAIICHI SANKYO, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C-1, #4 Exhibit C-2, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(CHRISTIAN, RANDALL)
February 7, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF CONFERENCE: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 2/27/2020 05:00 PM IN COURTROOM 10A BEFORE HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE. (Attachments: #1 Electronic Discovery Order, #2 Joint Report and Discovery Plan)(amw, )
January 29, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by JEANNINE M. KENNEY on behalf of ROBERT COLE(KENNEY, JEANNINE)
January 24, 2020 Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #16 MOTION TO STAY. SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 1/24/2020.1/24/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nm, )
January 22, 2020 Filing 16 Joint MOTION to Stay RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS AND RELATED FILINGS filed by AMERICAN REGENT, INC., DAIICHI SANKYO US HOLDINGS, INC., DAIICHI SANKYO, INC..Proposed Order, Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(CHRISTIAN, RANDALL)
December 12, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF THE STATUS CONFERENCE CALL SET FOR DECEMBER 17, 2019 AT 3:00 P.M. - RESET FOR A STATUS CONFERENCE IN COURT ON THURSDAY, JANUARY 16, 2020 AT 2:00 P.M. IN COURTROOM 10 A. PLEASE MAKE NOTE OF THIS CHANGE IN DATE AND TIME. THANK YOU. (amw, )
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #13 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE. RESPONSES DUE BY 2/10/2020. REPLIES DUE BY 2/17/2020. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 11/12/19. 11/13/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED. (va, )
November 8, 2019 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply [EXPEDITED] filed by AMERICAN REGENT, INC., DAIICHI SANKYO US HOLDINGS, INC., DAIICHI SANKYO, INC., LUITPOLD PHARMACEUTICALS, INC..Proposed Order, Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(CHRISTIAN, RANDALL)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER THAT THE #11 MOTION TO APPROVE ASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES TO JUDGE WENDY BEETLESTONE IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 9/24/19. 9/24/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED & E-MAILED. COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS. (fdc)
September 17, 2019 Filing 11 Joint MOTION TO CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ TO APPROVE ASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES TO JUDGE WENDY BEETLESTONE filed by AMERICAN REGENT, INC., DAIICHI SANKYO US HOLDINGS, INC., DAIICHI SANKYO, INC..Proposed Order, Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(CHRISTIAN, RANDALL)
September 10, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by AMERICAN REGENT, INC., DAIICHI SANKYO US HOLDINGS, INC., DAIICHI SANKYO, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(CHRISTIAN, RANDALL)
August 28, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript with Certificate of Service re #8 Transcript - PDF, 8/30/19 Entered and Copies Emailed. (va, )
August 28, 2019 Filing 8 TRANSCRIPT of CONFERENCE CALL held on 7/30/19, before Judge WENDY BEETLESTONE. Court Reporter/Transcriber SHANNAN GAGLIARDI. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/18/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/30/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/26/2019. (va, )
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by JEANNINE M. KENNEY on behalf of ROBERT COLE with Certificate of Service(KENNEY, JEANNINE)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED CONFERENCE AT THE REQUEST OF THE SERVED DEFENDANTS: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE RESET FOR 8/30/2019 02:00 PM IN COURTROOM 10A BEFORE THE HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE.
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 Minute Entry for TELEPHONE CONFERENCE CALL held on 7/30/19, before Judge WENDY BEETLESTONE. Court Reporter/Transcriber ESR. (jaa, )
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 8/21/2019 09:30 AM IN COURTROOM 10-A BEFORE HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 7/30/19. 8/1/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(jaa, ) Modified on 8/1/2019 (jaa, ).
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ROBERT COLE. DAIICH SANKYO US HOLDINGS, INC. waiver sent on 7/12/2019, answer due 9/10/2019; DAIICHI SANKYO, INC. waiver sent on 7/12/2019, answer due 9/10/2019. (DALY, MICHAEL) Modified on 7/25/2019 (md).
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ROBERT COLE. AMERICAN REGENT, INC. waiver sent on 7/12/2019, answer due 9/10/2019. (DALY, MICHAEL) Modified on 7/22/2019 (fb).
July 9, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ROBERT COLE. (jaa, )
July 9, 2019 6 Summons Issued as to AMERICAN REGENT, INC., DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO US HOLDINGS, INC., DAIICHI SANKYO, INC., LUITPOLD PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VIFOR PHARMACEUTICALS MANAGEMENT LTD.. Forwarded To: COUNSEL on 7/10/19 (jaa, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE against AMERICAN REGENT, INC., DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO US HOLDINGS, INC., DAIICHI SANKYO, INC., LUITPOLD PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VIFOR PHARMACEUTICALS MANAGEMENT LTD. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE200214.) filed by ROBERT COLE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jaa, ) Modified on 7/10/2019 (jaa, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COLE v. LUITPOLD PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAIICHI SANKYO, INC.
Represented By: RANDALL L. CHRISTIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIFOR PHARMACEUTICALS MANAGEMENT LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN REGENT, INC.
Represented By: RANDALL L. CHRISTIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAIICHI SANKYO US HOLDINGS, INC.
Represented By: RANDALL L. CHRISTIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUITPOLD PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Represented By: RANDALL L. CHRISTIAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT COLE
Represented By: MICHAEL G. DALY
Represented By: JEANNINE M. KENNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?