HERNANDEZ v. HYSTER-YALE GROUP, INC.
Plaintiff: ARTURO QUINTANA HERNANDEZ
Defendant: HYSTER-YALE MATERIALS HANDLING, INC. and HYSTER-YALE GROUP, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02999
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOSHUA D WOLSON
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER THAT COUNSEL FOR THE PARTIES ARE TO APPEAR FOR A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/2/2019 AT 11:00 AM IN ROOM 3809 AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 08/29/19. 08/29/19 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(ja,)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Hyster-Yale Materials Handling, Inc. by HYSTER-YALE GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(GREY, FRANCIS)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by HYSTER-YALE GROUP, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(GREY, FRANCIS)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by FRANCIS J. GREY, JR on behalf of HYSTER-YALE GROUP, INC. with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(GREY, FRANCIS)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE COMPLAINT IS HEREBY AMENDED SO THAT ALL ALLEGATIONS AGAINST HYSTER-YALE MATERIALS HANDLING, INC., ARE NOW MADE AGAINST HYSTER-YALE GROUP INC. HYSTER-YALE GROUP, INC., IS NOW THE DEFT IN THIS CASE. HYSTER-YALE MATERIALS HANDLING, INC. IS HEREBY DISMISSED, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOSHUA D. WOLSON ON 8/2/19. 8/5/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
July 10, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by ARTURO QUINTANA HERNANDEZ. (jwl, )
July 10, 2019 Summons Issued as to HYSTER-YALE MATERIALS HANDLING, INC.. One Forwarded To: Counsel on 7/11/19 (jwl, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HYSTER-YALE MATERIALS HANDLING, INC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 200253.), filed by ARTURO QUINTANA HERNANDEZ.(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HERNANDEZ v. HYSTER-YALE GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARTURO QUINTANA HERNANDEZ
Represented By: JOHN NEUMANN HICKEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HYSTER-YALE MATERIALS HANDLING, INC.
Represented By: REBECCA E. LEONARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HYSTER-YALE GROUP, INC.
Represented By: FRANCIS J. GREY, JR.
Represented By: REBECCA E. LEONARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?