WALKER v. GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY (GEICO)
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY M. WALKER, JR.
Defendant: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY (GEICO)
Case Number: 2:2019cv03016
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: C DARNELL JONES
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Count IV of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by TIMOTHY M. WALKER, JR. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Brief Brief in Support of Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, #3 Certificate of Service Cert of Service, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B First Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit Exhibit C 10-4-18 letter to GEICO, #7 Exhibit Exhibit D November 2018 GEICO Letter, #8 Exhibit Exhibit E 2-21-19 Letter to GEICO, #9 Exhibit Exhibit F 3-12-19 GEICO Letter, #10 Exhibit Exhibit G Letter to Reviewer, #11 Exhibit Exhibit H 6-7-19 GEICO Letter)(KAPLAN, RANDY)
August 16, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Count IV of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY (GEICO).Brief, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(KULP, PETER)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 First Amended Complaint against GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY (GEICO) filed by TIMOTHY M. WALKER, JR. (Attachments: #1 Ex A, #2 Ex B, #3 Ex C, #4 Ex D, #5 Ex E, #6 Ex F, #7 Ex G, #8 Ex H)(mbh, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss AS TO COUNT IV OF PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT filed by GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY (GEICO).Brief.(CAHALL, ROBERT)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY (GEICO).(CAHALL, ROBERT)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY (GEICO) from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County, Pennsylvania, case number 19-006244. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 200303)(fdc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WALKER v. GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY (GEICO)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY M. WALKER, JR.
Represented By: RANDY H. KAPLAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY (GEICO)
Represented By: ROBERT J. CAHALL
Represented By: PETER R. KULP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?