CAPPUCCIO et al v. STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: FRANK CAPPUCIO, LINDA CAPPUCIO, FRANK CAPPUCCIO and LINDA CAPPUCCIO
Defendant: STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv03025
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JOHN R PADOVA
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Count II of Plaintiffs Complaint filed by FRANK CAPPUCCIO, LINDA CAPPUCCIO. (DIULIO, ANTHONY) Modified on 8/5/2019 (tjd).
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Counsel of Filing Copy of Notice for Removal with State Court by BONNIE S. STEIN on behalf of STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY(STEIN, BONNIE)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Count II of Plaintiffs Complaint filed by STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(STEIN, BONNIE)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE CAPTION IN THE ABOVE-REFERENCED MATTER IS AMENDED TO REFLECT THE NAME OF PLFFS AS "FRANK CAPPUCCIO AND LINDA CAPPUCCIO" INSTEAD OF "FRANK CAPPUCIO AND LINDA CAPPUCIO. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 7/17/19. 7/18/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION to Amend Caption by FRANK CAPPUCIO.**(COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL)** (DIULIO, ANTHONY) Modified on 7/17/2019 (tjd).
July 15, 2019 Arbitration Certification that case exceeds the sum of $150,000.00 exclusive of interest and costs **(SEE DOCUMENT #3 FOR ORIGINAL FILING AND PDF)**(tjd)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Counsel Damages in Excess of $150,000.00 by ANTHONY JOSEPH DIULIO on behalf of FRANK CAPPUCIO(DIULIO, ANTHONY)
July 11, 2019 Case Eligible for Arbitration(jwl, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY.(jwl, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY from Common Pleas Philadelphia, case number 1906005278. Certificate of Service.(Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 200312) (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Designation Form)(jwl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CAPPUCCIO et al v. STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANK CAPPUCIO
Represented By: ANTHONY JOSEPH DIULIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA CAPPUCIO
Represented By: ANTHONY JOSEPH DIULIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANK CAPPUCCIO
Represented By: ANTHONY JOSEPH DIULIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA CAPPUCCIO
Represented By: ANTHONY JOSEPH DIULIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: BONNIE S. STEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?