BRADLEY et al v. HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. et al

Plaintiff: KENNETH BRADLEY and KATHLEEN BRADLEY
Defendant: EATON CORPORATION and HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Respondent: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv03032
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: EDUARDO C ROBRENO
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSHUA D. SCHEETS on behalf of HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. (SCHEETS, JOSHUA)
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by CASEY R COBURN on behalf of KATHLEEN BRADLEY, KENNETH BRADLEY with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(COBURN, CASEY)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL A. ROWE on behalf of KATHLEEN BRADLEY, KENNETH BRADLEY with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(ROWE, MICHAEL)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure with Certificate of Service by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY.(SINGER, STEWART)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY.(SINGER, STEWART)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY.(SINGER, STEWART)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by STEWART R. SINGER on behalf of METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY with Certificate of Service(SINGER, STEWART)
July 11, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by EATON CORPORATION, HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (sg, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by EATON CORPORATION, HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. from COURT OF COMMON PLEAS PHILADELPHIA COUNTY, case number 171203217. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 200350) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, EXHIBITS.(sg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRADLEY et al v. HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH BRADLEY
Represented By: EDWARD M. NASS
Represented By: MICHAEL A. ROWE
Represented By: CASEY R COBURN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHLEEN BRADLEY
Represented By: EDWARD M. NASS
Represented By: MICHAEL A. ROWE
Represented By: CASEY R COBURN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EATON CORPORATION
Represented By: TIFFANY GIANGIULIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: TIFFANY GIANGIULIO
Represented By: JOSHUA D. SCHEETS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: STEWART R. SINGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?