MALIBU MEDIA, LLC v. JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 68.81.187.55
Plaintiff: MALIBU MEDIA, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 68.81.187.55
Case Number: 2:2019cv03058
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: R BARCLAY SURRICK
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26(F) CONFERENCE IS GRANTED AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE R. BARCLAY SURRICK ON 8/9/2019.8/12/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 Memorandum re #7 First MOTION for Leave to File To Serve Third Party Subpoena filed by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(FIORE, CHRISTOPHER)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 First MOTION for Leave to File To Serve Third Party Subpoena filed by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(FIORE, CHRISTOPHER)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC re #5 Memorandum, #4 First MOTION for Leave to File To Serve Third Party Subpoena (FIORE, CHRISTOPHER)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 Memorandum re #4 First MOTION for Leave to File To Serve Third Party Subpoena filed by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(FIORE, CHRISTOPHER)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 First MOTION for Leave to File To Serve Third Party Subpoena filed by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(FIORE, CHRISTOPHER) Modified on 8/7/2019 (lvj, ).
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Copy of Form to Register of Copyrights. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(amas)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC.(amas)
July 12, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC. (amas )
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 68.81.187.55 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 200407.), filed by MALIBU MEDIA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, DESIGNATION FORM, CASE MANAGEMENT TRACK FORM)(amas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MALIBU MEDIA, LLC v. JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 68.81.187.55
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE SUBSCRIBER ASSIGNED IP ADDRESS 68.81.187.55
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MALIBU MEDIA, LLC
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER P. FIORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?