GAGO v. COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA
Petitioner: EDWIN GAGO
Respondent: COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA, TERESA DELBALSO, LAWRENCE S. KRASNER and JOSH SHAPIRO
Case Number: 2:2019cv03064
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GENE EK PRATTER
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus: (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by EDWIN GAGO. (jaa, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 APPLICATION FOR PRISONERS TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS filed by EDWIN GAGO.(jaa, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION FOR CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY filed by EDWIN GAGO.VERIFICATION.(jaa, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL filed by EDWIN GAGO.(jaa, )
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 REVISED PETITION UNDER 28 U.S.C SECTION 2254 FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS ON CORRECTED FORMS WITH VERIFICATION AND PROOF OF SERVICE by EDWIN GAGO. (jaa, ) Modified on 8/23/2019 (jaa, ).
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL FURNISH PETITIONER WITH A BLANK COPY OF THIS COURT'S CURRENT STANDARD FORM FOR FILING A PETITION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. SEC. 2254 AND AN APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS BEARING THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CIVIL ACTION NUMBER; PETITIONER SHALL SIGN COMPLETE AND RETURN THE FORMS AS DIRECTED TO THE CLERK OF COURT WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER; OR REMIT THE $5.OO FILING FEE WIHTIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER; FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER THIS ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 8/16/19. 8/21/19 ENTERED AND COPY OF ORDER AND FORMS MAILED TO PRO SE PETITIONER.(jpd, ) Modified on 8/22/2019 (lisad, ).
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (jwl, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by EDWIN GAGO. NO FEE. NO IFP. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jwl, ) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/16/2019) (jwl, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GAGO v. COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: EDWIN GAGO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: COMMONWEALTH OF PENNSYLVANIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: TERESA DELBALSO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: LAWRENCE S. KRASNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JOSH SHAPIRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?