DE LAGE LANDEN FINANCIAL FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. v. SANY AMERICA, INC.
Plaintiff: DE LAGE LANDEN FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.
Defendant: SANY AMERICA, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv03073
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: ROBERT F KELLY
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT BY SEPTEMBER 30, 2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ROBERT F. KELLY ON 8/15/19. 8/15/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(jaa, ) Modified on 8/16/2019 (tjd).
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 STIPULATION ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT by DE LAGE LANDEN FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.**(FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY, COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL)**. (HOLMES, C.) Modified on 8/15/2019 (tjd).
July 15, 2019 (1) Summons Issued as to SANY AMERICA, INC.. Forwarded To: counsel on 7/17/19. (kw, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SANY AMERICA, INC. (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number PPE200443), filed by DE LAGE LANDEN FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(kw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DE LAGE LANDEN FINANCIAL FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. v. SANY AMERICA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANY AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: STEPHEN M. REAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DE LAGE LANDEN FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: C. LAWRENCE HOLMES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?