THOMAS v. SAUL
Plaintiff: CHAMERE THOMAS
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Interested Party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Case Number: 2:2019cv03076
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: MARK A KEARNEY
Referring Judge: DAVID R STRAWBRIDGE
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 Affidavit of Service re: U.S. Marshal Service served Summons and Complaint upon Commissioner of Social Security and U.S. Attorney General by FedEx on 8/9/19 (mbh, )
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (mbh, )
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS RANDOMLY REASSIGNED TO THE CALENDAR OF THE HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY, DISTRICT JUDGE. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 8/2/19. 8/5/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) .
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 Social Security Declining Magistrate Consent by CHAMERE THOMAS.. (SAVOY, ROBERT)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 Procedural Order 7/22/19 Entered and copies e-mailed. (mbh, )
July 19, 2019 Summons Issued as to ANDREW M. SAUL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (2) Forwarded To: U.S. Marshal Service on 7/22/19 and (1) given to U.S. Attorney (mbh, )
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL ISSUE SUMMONSES. THE U.S. MARSHAL FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA SHALL SERVE THE SUMMONSES AND THE COMPLAINT UPON SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION AND U.S. ATTORNEY GENERAL. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL SERVE U.S. ATTORNEY FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE DAVID R. STRAWBRIDGE ON 7/18/19.7/22/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 Social Security Notice of Case Assignment (Attachments: #1 Consent)(mbh, )
July 15, 2019 (3) Summons Issued as to ANDREW M. SAUL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (2) Forwarded To: U.S. Marshal Service on 7/16/19 and (1) given to U.S. Attorney. (mbh, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 Complaint against ANDREW M. SAUL filed by CHAMERE THOMAS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Coversheets)(mbh, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS FILED BY CHAMERE THOMAS.(mbh, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THOMAS v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHAMERE THOMAS
Represented By: ROBERT SAVOY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?