HE v. GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: ZHUDI HE
Defendant: GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY and GEICO CASUALITY COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv03079
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: GENE EK PRATTER
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY THE HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 9/10/2019. 9/10/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, ) (Main Document 8 replaced on 9/10/2019) (sfl, ).
August 13, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Count II of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by GEICO CASUALITY COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(TREDWELL, SCOTT)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 8/6/2019. 8/8/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sfl, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT J. TREDWELL on behalf of GEICO CASUALITY COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY (TREDWELL, SCOTT)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service re: served Complaint upon GEICO Indemnity Company by Certified Mail on 07/22/2019 (TOMLINSON, TYLER)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service re: served Complaint upon GEICO Casuality Company by Certified Mail on 07/22/2019 (TOMLINSON, TYLER)
July 15, 2019 Case Eligible for Arbitration(jwl, )
July 15, 2019 Summons Issued as to GEICO CASUALITY COMPANY , GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. Two Forwarded To: Counsel on 7/17/19 (jwl, ) Modified on 7/17/2019 (jwl, ). Modified on 7/17/2019 (jwl, ).
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 filed by ZHUDI HE. (jwl, ) Modified on 7/17/2019 (lisad, ).
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GEICO CASUALITY COMPANY , GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 200460.), filed by ZHUDI HE.(jwl, ) Modified on 7/17/2019 (jwl, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HE v. GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZHUDI HE
Represented By: TYLER TOMLINSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY
Represented By: SCOTT J. TREDWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO CASUALITY COMPANY
Represented By: SCOTT J. TREDWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?