TRUSTEES OF THE NATIONAL ELEVATOR INDUSTRY PENSION FUND et al v. EASTERN ELEVATOR SERVICE, INC. et al
Plaintiff: TRUSTEES OF THE NATIONAL ELEVATOR INDUSTRY HEALTH BENEFIT FUND, TRUSTEES OF THE NATIONAL ELEVATOR INDUSTRY PENSION FUND, TRUSTEES OF THE NATIONAL ELEVATOR INDUSTRY EDUCATIONAL FUND, TRUSTEES OF THE ELEVATOR CONSTRUCTORS ANNUITY AND 401(K) RETIREMENT FUND and TRUSTEES OF THE ELEVATOR INDUSTRY WORK PRESERVATION FUND
Defendant: ROBERT RAUCH and EASTERN ELEVATOR SERVICE, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv03099
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: JAN E DUBOIS
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Filing 8 Letter FROM WILLIAM E STACEY, JR. dated 9/12/2019. (sg, )
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED THAT THE JOINT REQUEST FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME FROM 9/11/2019 TO 9/27/2019 FOR RESPONDING TO TEH COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE 9/27/2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE DEPUTY CLERK SHALL SERVE COPIES OF THIS ORDER ON COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS AND ON WILLIAM STACEY, ESQUIRE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 9/12/2019. 9/13/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL AND WILLIAM STACEY, ESQUIRE.(sg, )
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TRUSTEES OF THE NATIONAL ELEVATOR INDUSTRY PENSION FUND, TRUSTEES OF THE ELEVATOR CONSTRUCTORS ANNUITY AND 401(K) RETIREMENT FUND, TRUSTEES OF THE ELEVATOR INDUSTRY WORK PRESERVATION FUND, TRUSTEES OF THE NATIONAL ELEVATOR INDUSTRY HEALTH BENEFIT FUND, TRUSTEES OF THE NATIONAL ELEVATOR INDUSTRY EDUCATIONAL FUND re: Andres Mazuera served Summons and Complaint upon ROBERT RAUCH by Substitute Service. ROBERT RAUCH served on 8/14/2019, answer due 9/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service on Defendant Robert Rauch, #2 Certificate of Service)(KELSER, ANDREW)
September 3, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by TRUSTEES OF THE NATIONAL ELEVATOR INDUSTRY PENSION FUND, TRUSTEES OF THE ELEVATOR CONSTRUCTORS ANNUITY AND 401(K) RETIREMENT FUND, TRUSTEES OF THE ELEVATOR INDUSTRY WORK PRESERVATION FUND, TRUSTEES OF THE NATIONAL ELEVATOR INDUSTRY HEALTH BENEFIT FUND, TRUSTEES OF THE NATIONAL ELEVATOR INDUSTRY EDUCATIONAL FUND re: Andres Mazuera served Summons and Complaint upon EASTERN ELEVATOR SERVICE, INC. by Authorized Service. EASTERN ELEVATOR SERVICE, INC. served on 7/31/2019, answer due 9/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service on Defendant Eastern Elevator Service, Inc., #2 Certificate of Service)(KELSER, ANDREW)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER TO JUDGE DUBOIS, FROM WILLIAM E. STACEY, JR. ESQ., DATED 8/27/2019 RE: EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER. (sg, )
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED THAT THE JOINT REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL TIME IS GRANTED. DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE AND SERVE THEIR RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE 9/11/2019 AS OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 8/27/2019. 8/30/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO COUNSEL AND WILLIAM STACEY, ESQUIRE.(sg, )
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDERED THAT DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR A TWENTY DAY EXTENSION OF TIME FOR RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IS GRANTED. DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE AND SERVE THEIR RESPONSE TO THE COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE 8/28/2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE DEPUTY CLERK SHALL SERVE COPIES OF THIS ORDER ON COUNSEL FOR PLAITNIFFS AND ON WILLIAM STACEY, ESQUIRE.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 8/8/2019. 8/13/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(sg, )
July 16, 2019 Summons Issued as to EASTERN ELEVATOR SERVICE, INC., ROBERT RAUCH. Two Forwarded To: Counsel on 7/17/19 (jwl, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EASTERN ELEVATOR SERVICE, INC., ROBERT RAUCH ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-13672892.), filed by TRUSTEES OF THE NATIONAL ELEVATOR INDUSTRY PENSION FUND, TRUSTEES OF THE ELEVATOR CONSTRUCTORS ANNUITY AND 401(K) RETIREMENT FUND, TRUSTEES OF THE ELEVATOR INDUSTRY WORK PRESERVATION FUND, TRUSTEES OF THE NATIONAL ELEVATOR INDUSTRY HEALTH BENEFIT FUND, TRUSTEES OF THE NATIONAL ELEVATOR INDUSTRY EDUCATIONAL FUND. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form, #4 Certificate of Service)(KELSER, ANDREW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TRUSTEES OF THE NATIONAL ELEVATOR INDUSTRY PENSION FUND et al v. EASTERN ELEVATOR SERVICE, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRUSTEES OF THE NATIONAL ELEVATOR INDUSTRY HEALTH BENEFIT FUND
Represented By: ANDREW KELSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRUSTEES OF THE NATIONAL ELEVATOR INDUSTRY PENSION FUND
Represented By: ANDREW KELSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRUSTEES OF THE NATIONAL ELEVATOR INDUSTRY EDUCATIONAL FUND
Represented By: ANDREW KELSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRUSTEES OF THE ELEVATOR CONSTRUCTORS ANNUITY AND 401(K) RETIREMENT FUND
Represented By: ANDREW KELSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRUSTEES OF THE ELEVATOR INDUSTRY WORK PRESERVATION FUND
Represented By: ANDREW KELSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT RAUCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EASTERN ELEVATOR SERVICE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?