IN RE: RENEE MARIE THORPE

Trustee: MICHAEL B. JOSEPH and UNITED STATES TRUSTEE
Debtor In Possession: RENEE MARIE THORPE
Appellant: JOSEPH Q. MIRARCHI LEGAL SERVICES, P.C.
Case Number: 2:2019cv03102
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: WENDY BEETLESTONE
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy: Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 Appellant's BRIEF by JOSEPH Q. MIRARCHI LEGAL SERVICES, P.C.. Appellee Brief due by 9/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Brief originally filed on September 9, 2019)(SILVER, GARY)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 Briefing Schedule 8/9/2019 Entered and copies mailed and e-mailed. (ahf)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 Original Bankruptcy record together with designation of record on appeal received. (Attachments: #1 counse sheet, appeal, des, #2 part 1, #3 part 2, #4 part 3, #5 part 4, #6 part 5, #7 part 6, #8 part 7 (1 of 2), #9 part 7 (2 of 2), #10 part 8, #11 part 9, #12 part 10)(ahf)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 Certificate of Appeal of JOSEPH Q. MIRARCHI LEGAL SERVICES, P.C. from the order of Bankruptcy Judge Eric J. Frank filed on 6/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Docket with memo, appeal,, #2 Civil Cover Sheets)(ahf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE: RENEE MARIE THORPE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: MICHAEL B. JOSEPH
Represented By: MICHAEL B. JOSEPH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: UNITED STATES TRUSTEE
Represented By: FREDERIC J. BAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor in possession: RENEE MARIE THORPE
Represented By: WILLIAM H. HALL, IV
Represented By: ROGER V. ASHODIAN
Represented By: JENNIFER SONG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: JOSEPH Q. MIRARCHI LEGAL SERVICES, P.C.
Represented By: GARY SCOTT SILVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?